Puma Energy Caribe, LLC v. Odeh et al
Plaintiff: Puma Energy Caribe, LLC
Defendant: Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa Cortes, Odeh Petroleum, Inc., Mohamed Awadallah Odeh and Samuel Musa-Cortes
Case Number: 3:2020cv01225
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 145 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/24/2021.(MPL)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: Granting #141 "Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Remaining Causes of Action." Remaining causes of action are hereby dismissed. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/24/2021. (MPL)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Granting #142 "Motion to Restrict Filing." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/24/2021. (ebb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 142 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
August 23, 2021 Filing 141 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**Joint NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stipulation by All Parties. (Estrella, Alberto) Modified on 8/24/2021 to add filers (mcm).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Granting #139 "Urgent Consented to Motion for a Litigation Hold While the Parties Conduct and Conclude Settlement Negotiations." Not later than August 21, 2021, the parties shall file a joint motion informing the status of the case. Should the parties reach a settlement before said date, they shall so inform jointly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/9/2021. (MPL)
August 6, 2021 Filing 139 Emergency MOTION for extension of time until August 21,2021 to to grant the parties 15 days to conclude settlement negotiations and inform the Court filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: Noting #137 "Motion Submitting Certified Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/2/2021. (ebb)
August 2, 2021 Filing 137 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #133 MOTION PUMA's Objections re #132 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translations)(Related document(s) #133 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose) Modified on 8/3/2021 to replace italics (mcm).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: Granting #135 "Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Opposition to Puma's Objection to Report and Recommendation [DKT. NO. 133]." Reply due August 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/28/2021. (MPL)
July 27, 2021 Filing 135 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 6,2021 to File Response/Reply to PUMA's Objections as to 134 Order, #132 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Amended Co filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 8/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 134 , #132 ) (Robles-Diaz, Nelson) Modified on 7/28/2021 to replace italics font (mcm).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re: #133 "Puma Energy Caribe, LLC's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation." Co-defendant Odeh Petroleum Inc. shall respond not later than July 30, 2021.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/16/2021.(MPL)
July 15, 2021 Filing 133 OBJECTION to REPORT AND RECOMENDATION PUMA's Objections re #132 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Amended Counterclaim filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose) Modified on 7/16/2021 to correct event(mcm).
July 1, 2021 Filing 132 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Amended Counterclaim filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc.: I recommend that the court grant OPI's motion for leave to amend and deny Puma's motion to dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/1/2021. (jm)
May 27, 2021 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #130 Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
May 13, 2021 Filing 130 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Partial) at Dkt. No. 124 filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Re: #124 Report and Recommendation, filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc.. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER noted #122 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on May 12, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 PARTIAL JUDGMENT: See attached. In accordance with the Order issued at Docket No. 127, and based on the terms of the settlement agreement approved and adopted at Docket No. 89, partial judgment is hereby entered dismissing the claim for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/6/2021.(MPL)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: Noting #91 "Motion to Brief Court in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 89" and noting #92 "Motion in Compliance of Order at Docket No. 89." In reviewing the parties' filings, the court has considered the arguments proffered in support of the entry of partial judgment as to the claim for injunctive relief. In so doing, it finds that in these circumstances, and based on the terms of the settlement agreement approved and adopted at Docket No. 89, there is no reason to delay the entry of partial judgment. Partial judgment will be entered accordingly.. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/5/2021.(MPL)
May 3, 2021 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #125 MOTION to request leave to file Rule 26 Report after resolution of MTDs re #105 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, #115 MOTION requesting Order in relation to Motion for amendments to format to DKT No.1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Estrella, Alberto)
April 30, 2021 Filing 125 MOTION to request leave to file Rule 26 Report after resolution of MTDs re #105 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, #115 MOTION requesting Order in relation to Motion for amendments to format to DKT No.112 filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc., #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #103 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #110 MOTION to Amend/Correct (errata) in relation to prayer for relief at Dkt. No 109 Re: 108 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #109 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2021 to File Response/Reply < filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc., #121 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Amended Counterclaim filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc., #98 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, #112 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc., MOTION requesting Order filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 5/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #105 , #115 , #104 , #103 , #110 , #121 , #111 , #98 , #112 ) (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
April 29, 2021 Filing 124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #98 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6): I recommend dismissing all causes of action against Odeh acting in his personal capacity except that for breach of contract. Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 4/29/2021. (jm)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Leave to File; granting #117 Motion for extension of time. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 28, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
April 27, 2021 Filing 122 MOTION to Amend/Correct References to the Puerto Rico Civil Code Re: #121 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 5/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 27, 2021 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion at ECF No. 112 and Opposition to ECF No. 111 filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Amended Counterclaim filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER noted and granted #115 Motion requesting Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 22, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER noted #110 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 16, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Noting #116 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/14/2021. (ebb)
April 13, 2021 Filing 117 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Defendant's Opposition to PUMA's Motion to Dismiss, Consent MOTION for extension of time until April 27, 2021 to file reply and oppose Defendant's motion for leave to amend filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 4/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 13, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 7, 2021 Filing 115 MOTION requesting Order in relation to Motion for amendments to format to DKT No.112 filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 4/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 7, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 7, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
April 6, 2021 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim [Dkt.No.104] filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Amended Counterclaim filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc.. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
April 6, 2021 Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Amended Counterclaim filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 4/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
April 1, 2021 Filing 110 MOTION to Amend/Correct (errata) in relation to prayer for relief at Dkt. No 109 Re: 108 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #109 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2021 to File Response/Reply to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to Fed. R Civ. P 12 (b) (6) as to #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, L filed by Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 4/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 108 , #109 ) (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
March 23, 2021 Filing 109 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2021 to File Response/Reply to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to Fed. R Civ. P 12 (b) (6) as to #104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 4/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #104 ) (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on March 19, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
March 4, 2021 Filing 107 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 25,2021 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 3/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on February 23, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
February 19, 2021 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Reply, REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) [Dkt. No. 103 filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh Re: #98 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson) Modified on 2/22/2021 to edit event title (mcm).
February 19, 2021 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 3/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Invoice)(Estrella, Alberto)
February 12, 2021 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss at Dkt. No. 98 filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #98 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on February 12, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on February 12, 2021. (McGiverin, Bruce)
February 7, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION for Extension of Time until Feb 19, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #97 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 2/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
January 28, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/12/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #98 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 2/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #98 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
January 20, 2021 Filing 98 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Mohamed Awadallah Odeh Responses due by 2/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
January 20, 2021 Filing 97 ANSWER to #90 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Mohamed Awaldallah Odeh and Odeh Petroleum, Inc. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson) Modified on 1/21/2021 to correct filers in docket text (mcm).
January 20, 2021 Filing 96 ANSWER to #90 Amended Complaint filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of Defendants Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes.(Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
December 22, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 21, 2021 to file Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER finding as moot #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The #90 amended complaint has superseded the pleading alleged by this motion to be defective. To the extent applicable, defendant may raise his arguments in a new motion to dismiss the amended complaint. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on December 15, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on December 15, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
December 15, 2020 Filing 92 Motion In Compliance with Order as to 89 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion Submitting, filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 89 ) (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
December 14, 2020 Filing 91 Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket No. 89 filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 12/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
December 4, 2020 Filing 90 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes, Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc., filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC.(Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Granting in part #84 "Motion to Submit Settlement Agreement and Request for Issuance of Partial Judgment." The Settlement Agreement at Docket No. 84-1 is approved and adopted. The court will retain jurisdiction to enforce its terms and conditions. The claims for injunctive relief are dismissed. The court, however, will not issue a partial judgment at this juncture, as the First Circuit strongly disfavors those types of judgments. See, Nichols v. Cafle Co., 101 F.3d 1448, 1449 (discussing topic). Those judgments are to be used sparingly. See, Fernandez v. Hoyos, 2008 WL 2026010, *6 & n. (D.P.R. May 8, 2008)(collecting cases). Therefore, by December 15, 2020, the parties shall brief the court on whether a partial judgment may be entered here, including reference to authorities and caselaw involving the same or analogous setting out of which the partial judgment issue arose. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/1/2020. (MPL)
November 30, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 4, 2020 to Amend Complaint filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 12/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 24, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
November 9, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Amendment to the Verified Complaint) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER noted and granting #81 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 3, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 27, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION Submitting Parties' (Partial) Settlement Agreement and Request for Partial Judgment filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2020-10-26_Settlement_Agreement_and_Request_for_Partial_Judgment)(Estrella, Alberto)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #80 Motion for extension of time. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 23, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER noted and granted #78 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 19, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 16, 2020 Filing 81 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Settlement Negotiations filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants and Plaintiff. Responses due by 10/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus) Modified on 10/19/2020 to add filer (rom).
October 8, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for extension of time until October 16, 2020 to comply with Court's Deadline filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 10/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER noted and granted #77 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 5, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 2, 2020 Filing 78 Second INFORMATIVE Motion regarding status of settlement agreement and request for brief extension of time to file the same filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes, Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
September 18, 2020 Filing 77 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Settlement Negotiations filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes, Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. Responses due by 10/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER finding as moot #70 Motion to Withdraw Document. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on September 8, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
September 4, 2020 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Settlement teleconference was held on 9/4/2020. Joint informative motion regarding any agreement as to ECF No. #2 due by 9/18/2020. (jm)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER noted #68 Motion submitting. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on September 3, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER finding as moot #64 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on August 27, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Emergency Motion to Continue: Settlement Teleconference is reset for 9/4/2020 at 3:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/25/2020. (jm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 71 Emergency MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference Set for Tomorrow August 26th 2020 filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
August 24, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw Document re: #64 MOTION Requesting Reset Settlement Conference re 62 Order on Motion for Setting, filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on August 21, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 19, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION Submitting Certified English translation of Document at Docket Nos. 54 and 55 re: #54 MOTION Leave to Add One Document to Puma Proposed Exhibits List filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, 66 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, #55 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents at Docket No. 54 filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 9/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Exhibit 48)(Related document(s) #54 , 66 , #55 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on August 17, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on August 17, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on August 17, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 12, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION Requesting Reset Settlement Conference re 62 Order on Motion for Setting, filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 8/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 62 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying without prejudice #44 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Plaintiff may reassert the arguments raised in this motion if and when defendants attempt to introduce facts contrary to those they set forth in the answer to the complaint. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on August 10, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Setting: A Settlement Teleconference is set for 8/26/2020 at 3:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Teleconference bridge information will be sent by e-mail. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/10/2020. (jm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION Concerning Puma's Request of Court's Approval for the Retrieval of the USTs at Station #802 filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
August 6, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION Leave to Add Photos to List of Proposed Exhibits filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photo 1 SS#802, #2 Exhibit Photo 2 SS#802, #3 Exhibit Photo 3 SS#802 (Sign))(Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
July 31, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Restrict Document (Docket Nos. 52 & 58) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 8/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
July 31, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #52 MOTION for Setting of Settlement Conference filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Samuel Musa-Cortes, Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Estrella, Alberto)
July 31, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #44 MOTION to have Defendants' Admissions in their answers to the Verified Complaint deemed admitted for all purposes filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #51 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition at Docket No. 50 filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 31, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 31, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents at Docket No. 54 filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 8/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
July 31, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION Leave to Add One Document to Puma Proposed Exhibits List filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 8/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DRNA Permit)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
July 26, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Intent to Respond to DN 52 by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC re #52 MOTION for Setting of Settlement Conference (Estrella, Alberto)
July 25, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Setting of Settlement Conference filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
July 16, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition at Docket No. 50 filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 7/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
July 9, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Plaintiff at Docket #44 filed by All Defendants Re: #44 MOTION to have Defendants' Admissions in their answers to the Verified Complaint deemed admitted for all purposes filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by All Defendants. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER noted #39 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 7, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 7, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 7, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 6, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Puma's Response to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss at DN 43) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 7/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Sur Reply)(Estrella, Alberto)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 6, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 2, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to have Defendants' Admissions in their answers to the Verified Complaint deemed admitted for all purposes filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 7/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
June 29, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R Civ. P 12 (b) (6) filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh Re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
June 29, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION filing Joint Statement of Uncontested Facts re 41 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs and Defendants. Responses due by 7/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 41 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 6/30/2020 to add filers (rom).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on June 29, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Verified Complaint. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/23/2020. (jm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION tendering Reply to Defendants' Motion in Opposition to Petition for Preliminary Injunction at DN 26 filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 7/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Puma Energy Caribe LLC's Reply to Defendants' Motion in Opposition to petition for preliminary injunction at DN 26)(Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
June 22, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 29, 2020 to file Stipulation of Uncontested Facts filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
June 19, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Add two Documents to Puma Proposed Exhibits List filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 7/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email to Defendants'Counsel with Supplement Notice, #2 Exhibit 1A - Order from CAPECO's Bankruptcy Matter, #3 Exhibit 1C - EPA-Puma Compliance Agreement April 2011)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Estrella, Alberto)
June 12, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Memorandum and for extension of time until June 22, 2020 filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 6/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on June 12, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on June 12, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER noted #17 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on June 12, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on June 12, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Summons have been issued. See DE 5. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on June 12, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
June 7, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Verified Complaint Re: #25 Answer to Complaint,, filed by Samuel Musa-Cortes, Guaynabo Fuel Corp. filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes Responses due by 6/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Errata of the Answer to the Complaint)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
June 5, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Mohamed Awadallah Odeh Responses due by 6/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
June 5, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Defendants Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A- Certification, #4 Exhibit B 1, #5 Exhibit B 2, #6 Exhibit B 3, #7 Exhibit B 4, #8 Exhibit B 5, #9 Exhibit B 6, #10 Exhibit B 7, #11 Exhibit B 8, #12 Exhibit C)(Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
June 5, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Petition for Preliminary Injunction filed by Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes, Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes, Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc.. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
June 5, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of Defendants Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of the Answer to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit A of the Declaration, #3 Exhibit B-1of the Declaration, #4 Exhibit B-2 of the Declaration, #5 Exhibit B-3 of the Declaration, #6 Exhibit B-4 of the Declaration, #7 Exhibit B-5 of the Declaration, #8 Exhibit B-6 of the Declaration, #9 Exhibit B-7 of the Declaration, #10 Exhibit B-8 of the Declaration, #11 Exhibit 2 of the Answer to the Complaint)(Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
May 28, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Pending Certified Translations) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 6/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 18)(Estrella, Alberto)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin to preside over all non-dispositive pre-trial proceedings, except the Pre-Trial Conference that will be set, if necessary, and presided by the undersigned. All dispositive matters are also referred to him for report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/28/2020. (MPL)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: By not later than June 5, 2020, defendants shall file a response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. By not later than June 12, 2020, the parties shall exchange all exhibits they propose to use at a preliminary injunction hearing, and a list of names of all witnesses they intend to call with a brief summary of their likely testimony. The court will not admit at the hearing any exhibit or witness not timely disclosed. By June 16, 2020, counsel shall hold a video or telephone conference to try to settle this case. If no settlement is reached, counsel shall file a joint stipulation of uncontested facts by June 22, 2020. A date for a preliminary injunction hearing will be set promptly once the court reviews the parties's stipulations. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by 6/5/2020. Joint stipulation of uncontested facts due by 6/22/2020. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/27/2020. (jm)
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 8, 2020. to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Samuel Musa-Cortes, Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Odeh Petroleum, Inc. filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Estrella, Alberto)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting #19 "Notice of Intention to Respond to Docket No. 18." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/27/2020. (MPL)
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Intent to Respond to DN 18 by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 8, 2020. to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Estrella, Alberto)
May 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 8, 2020. to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 2-B, #5 Exhibit 2-C, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jesus R. Morales-Cordero on behalf of Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa-Cortes Responses due by 6/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Cordero, Jesus)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Noting #15 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/26/2020. (ebb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Noting #13 "Motion Clarifying Compliance with Order." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/14/2020. (ebb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 Motion In Compliance as to #8 Order,, filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 5/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Affidavit Process Server)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Noting #11 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/13/2020. (ebb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 5/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17)(Estrella, Alberto)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: See attached. The request for a Temporary Restraining Order at Docket No. 2 is DENIED. The case is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin to hold a hearing on the Preliminary Injunction requested and issue a Report and Recommendation. Service of process in accordance with this order is due by noontime on May 18, 2020. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by May 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/11/2020. (MPL)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noting #6 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/11/2020. (ebb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Guaynabo Fuel Corp., Samuel Musa Cortes, Mohamed Awadallah Odeh, Odeh Petroleum, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 5/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Odeh Petroleum, #2 Summons Guaynabo Fuel Corp., #3 Summons Mohamed Odeh, #4 Summons Samuel Musa Cortes)(Estrella, Alberto)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, Permanent Injunction and Order to Show Cause filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 5/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Estrella, Alberto)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6879522.), filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. Service due by 8/6/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Claudia Pea, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Fernando Rodriguez, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Jose Valentin, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Carlos Figueroa, #7 Exhibit 1a, #8 Exhibit 1b, #9 Exhibit 2a, #10 Exhibit 2b, #11 Exhibit 2c, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit 4a, #14 Exhibit 4b, #15 Exhibit 4c, #16 Exhibit 5a, #17 Exhibit 5b, #18 Exhibit 5c, #19 Exhibit 5d, #20 Exhibit 5e, #21 Exhibit 5f, #22 Exhibit 5g, #23 Exhibit 5h, #24 Exhibit 6, #25 Exhibit 7, #26 Exhibit 8, #27 Exhibit 9, #28 Exhibit 10, #29 Exhibit 11, #30 Exhibit 12, #31 Exhibit 13, #32 Exhibit 14, #33 Exhibit 15, #34 Exhibit 16, #35 Exhibit 17, #36 Exhibit 18, #37 Exhibit 18, #38 Exhibit 20, #39 Exhibit 21)(Estrella, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puma Energy Caribe, LLC v. Odeh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaynabo Fuel Corp.
Represented By: Jesus R. Morales-Cordero
Represented By: Nelson Robles-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Musa Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odeh Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Jesus R. Morales-Cordero
Represented By: Nelson Robles-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Awadallah Odeh
Represented By: Jesus R. Morales-Cordero
Represented By: Nelson Robles-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Musa-Cortes
Represented By: Jesus R. Morales-Cordero
Represented By: Nelson Robles-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puma Energy Caribe, LLC
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?