Torres v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Angel Manuel Torres
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv01275
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 8), this case has been randomly reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 20-1275 (BJM). Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/25/2020.(ft)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER noted #7 INFORMATIVE motion. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Given plaintiff's consent, this case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/24/2020. (dv)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Jose Durand-Carrasquillo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Durand-Carrasquillo, Jose)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court reminds the parties that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. 28 U.S.C.A. 636(c). The Social Security Administration has consented to have all social security cases brought before a Magistrate Judge. This procedure could prove to be more expeditious, and therefore, less expensive, than a trial before a District Judge. The Plaintiff is, of course, also free "to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences." Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2). The Plaintiff is advised, however, that the increase in the Court's criminal docket may impede a reasonably timely disposition of this case. Hence, The Court hereby orders the Plaintiff to affirmatively state whether or not he consents to having the instant matter be entertained before a U.S. Magistrate Judge through the entry of judgment and his rationale underlying his decision on or before 6/29/2020. Failure to respond to this Order will be treated as an implied consent by the Plaintiff. The Court notes that the Magistrate Judges in the District of Puerto Rico are first-rate jurists with impeccable legal minds, integrity and judicial temperament. The Plaintiff should thus carefully consider the merits of consenting to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/15/2020. (mrr)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Exhibits in Compliance with Clerk's Notice Category Sheet filed by Jose Durand-Carrasquillo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Durand-Carrasquillo, Jose) Modified on 6/11/2020 to edit event and title (mcm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/11/2020 to correct format) (mcm).
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category Sheet(JS44) is incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/12/2020. (arg)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for review of SSDI decision against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6911485.), filed by Angel Manuel Torres. Service due by 9/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit Exhibit II, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Summons Commissioner of SS Adm., #6 Summons US District Attorney, #7 Appearance of Counsel)(Durand-Carrasquillo, Jose) Modified on 6/11/2020 to replace capital letters (mcm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Manuel Torres
Represented By: Jose Durand-Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?