Pagan v. oriental bank
Plaintiff: Irmgard Pagan
Defendant: oriental bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv01277
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Noting #14 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices, Orders, Pleadings and Documents." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/27/2020. (ebb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Oriental Bank (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #12 "Oriental Bank's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint or Responsive Pleading." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/27/2020. (MPL)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 4, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Irmgard Pagan-Rivera filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Bank Responses due by 8/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement byOriental Bank. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #9 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/24/2020. (ebb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Bank (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Oriental Bank (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re Issuance of Summons as to Oriental Bank filed by Jose R. Perez-Hernandez on behalf of Irmgard Pagan-Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Perez-Hernandez, Jose) Modified on 7/6/2020 to edit docket title (rom).
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Irmgard Pagan-Rivera (Perez-Hernandez, Jose)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Irmgard Pagan-Rivera (Perez-Hernandez, Jose)
June 24, 2020 Filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt number 0104-6926531 (arg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/11/2020. (arg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Oriental Bank. COMPLAINT, filed by Irmgard Pagan, re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/12/2020. (arg) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/11/2020 to correct case number in pdf document) (mcm).
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against oriental bank, filed by Irmgard Pagan. Service due by 9/8/2020,(Perez-Hernandez, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagan v. oriental bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irmgard Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: oriental bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?