United States of America v. Cruz et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Medscan, P.S.C. and William J Cruz
Case Number: 3:2020cv01294
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement (Docket No. #5 , Exhibit 1) submitted by the parties, the Court hereby enters final Judgment in favor of Plaintiff in accordance with all the terms and conditions executed by the parties, all of which are incorporated herein. THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/1/2020. (EA)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. The Court hereby approves the proposed Consent Judgment submitted by the parties. Judgment in favor of Plaintiff is to be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/1/2020. (EA)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear. Attys. Harry Anduze-Montano and Diego Corral Gonzalez are hereby authorized to appear on behalf of Medscan P.S.C. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/1/2020. (EA)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment in Affirmative Civil Enforcement Case filed by Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 7/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Settlement Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order and Judgment)(Lopez-Rivera, Rafael) Modified on 7/2/2020 change italics (gav).
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Diego Corral-Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corral-Gonzalez, Diego)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Harry Anduze-Montano on behalf of William J Cruz, Medscan, P.S.C. Responses due by 7/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Anduze-Montano, Harry)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopez-Rivera, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medscan, P.S.C.
Represented By: Diego Corral-Gonzalez
Represented By: Harry Anduze-Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Cruz
Represented By: Diego Corral-Gonzalez
Represented By: Harry Anduze-Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?