Martinez-Colon v. Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc.
Plaintiff: Carlos E. Martinez-Colon
Defendant: Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. and Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. doing business as Hospital Episcopal San Lucas
Case Number: 3:2020cv01327
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Final MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2020 to file Answer to Complaint or otherwise defend filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. Responses due by 9/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27 to File Answer To Complaint or Otherwise Defend re: #4 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. filed by Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #4 , #1 ) (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. Responses due by 8/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Executed Summons (certified translation), #2 Exhibit B - Collective Bargaining Agreement (certified translation))(Related document(s) #1 ) (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents, MOTION for Extension of Time to File English Translations filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. Responses due by 7/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 7/10/2020 and edited docket text (vso).
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, Superior Part of Ponce, case number PO2020CV00607. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6943369), filed by Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Executed Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Colon v. Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos E. Martinez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd Isgut-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital Inc. doing business as Hospital Episcopal San Lucas
Represented By: Lloyd Isgut-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?