T.D. Medical, Inc. v. Banco Santander de Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: T.D. Medical, Inc.
Defendant: Banco Santander de Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2020cv01342
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hans Eugenio Riefkohl-Hernandez on behalf of Banco Santander de Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Riefkohl-Hernandez, Hans)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 08/26/2020. (lir)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hans Eugenio Riefkohl-Hernandez on behalf of Banco Santander de Puerto Rico (Riefkohl-Hernandez, Hans)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for extension of time until September 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Banco Santander de Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/31/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.D. Medical, Inc. upon Banco Santander de Puerto Rico served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Schlump-Peters, Joan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Banco Santander de Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Banco Santander de Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6950338.), filed by T.D. Medical, Inc.. Service due by 10/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Schlump-Peters, Joan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.D. Medical, Inc. v. Banco Santander de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Santander de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Hans Eugenio Riefkohl-Hernandez
Represented By: Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.D. Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Joan Schlump-Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?