Condado 5, LLC v. Vaqueria Las Martas Inc
Interested Party: US Trustee, Chapter 13 Trustee Jose Carrion and Puerto Rico Milk Industry Regulatory Office
Appellee: Vaqueria Las Martas Inc
Appellant: Condado 5, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01344
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 Appellant's BRIEF by Condado 5, LLC. Appellee Brief due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I, Part 1, #2 Appendix Volume I, Part 2, #3 Appendix Volume I, Part 3, #4 Appendix Volume I, Part 4, #5 Appendix Volume I, Part 5, #6 Appendix Volume II)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for Extension of Time to File Certified Translations filed by Gustavo A. Chico-Barris on behalf of Condado 5, LLC Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2020 to file Appellant's Brief filed by Gustavo A. Chico-Barris on behalf of Condado 5, LLC Responses due by 9/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Transcript of Hearing filed by Alexandra Rodriguez-Diaz on behalf of Chapter 13 Trustee Jose Carrion Responses due by 9/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing 7/23/2019)(Rodriguez-Diaz, Alexandra)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Condado 5, LLC. Appellant Brief due by 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Items, #2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part1, #3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part2, #4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part3, #5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part4, #6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part5, #7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part6, #8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part7, #9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part8, #10 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part9, #11 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II, #12 Appellee's Designation of Items, #13 Motion to Inform Docket 169, #14 Motiion to Inform Docket 170, #15 Certified Docket)(babk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Errata filed by Gustavo A. Chico-Barris on behalf of Condado 5, LLC Responses due by 8/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Corrected Notice of Appeal)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 First NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Alexandra Rodriguez-Diaz on behalf of Chapter 13 Trustee Jose Carrion (Rodriguez-Diaz, Alexandra)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Cross Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Chapter 13 Trustee Jose Carrion. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Cross Appeal, #2 Order dkt 120, #3 Order dkt 147, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances C. Brunet-Uriarte on behalf of Condado 5, LLC (Brunet-Uriarte, Frances)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Condado 5, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 120, #3 Order dkt 147, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Condado 5, LLC v. Vaqueria Las Martas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chapter 13 Trustee Jose Carrion
Represented By: Jose R. Carrion-Morales
Represented By: Mayra M. Arguelles-Alvarez
Represented By: Juliel Perez-Mendez
Represented By: Nannette Marie Godreau-Vazquez
Represented By: Alexandra Rodriguez-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Puerto Rico Milk Industry Regulatory Office
Represented By: Edward W. Hill-Tollinche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vaqueria Las Martas Inc
Represented By: Lysette A. Morales-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Condado 5, LLC
Represented By: Camille N. Somoza-Castello
Represented By: Sonia Colon-Colon
Represented By: Gustavo A. Chico-Barris
Represented By: Frances C. Brunet-Uriarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?