Oriental Financial Services, LLC v. Lizardi Baldaguez
Petitioner: Oriental Financial Services, LLC
Respondent: Luis Lizardi Baldaguez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01348
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Oriental Financial Services, LLC. Luis Lizardi Baldaguez waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Waiver of Service of Summons) (Hernandez-Freire, Eduardo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Luis Lizardi Baldaguez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Financial Services, LLC (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Compel Compliance and Enforce Subpoena Issued by a Panel of Arbitrators of the Financial Industry Regulatory Authority against Luis Lizardi Baldaguez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6953256.), filed by Oriental Financial Services, LLC. Service due by 10/15/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Sheet, #9 Summons)(Hernandez-Freire, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oriental Financial Services, LLC v. Lizardi Baldaguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Luis Lizardi Baldaguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oriental Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Eduardo Luis Hernandez-Freire
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?