Santana-Sanchez v. Operators Inc.
Plaintiff: Gilberto Santana-Sanchez
Defendant: Restaurants Operators Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01359
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #19 Informative Motion and Motion Requesting Order: NOTED and DENIED, unless the parties agree to do so. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/16/2020.(brc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION requesting Order filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Gilberto Santana-Sanchez Responses due by 9/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/26/2020. (brc)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/26/2020. (brc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION Submitting CERTIFIED TRANSLATION OF EXHIBIT FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING re: #9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing a copy of the Notice of Removal with the Court of Puerto Rico, Superior Court of San Juan filed by Restaurants Operators Inc. filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. Responses due by 9/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION Submitting CERTIFIED TRANSLATION OF EXHIBIT FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL re: #7 Supplemental Motion to the Notice of Removal at Docket No. 1 re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Restaurants Operators Inc. filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. Responses due by 9/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/27/2020. (brc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/27/2020. (brc)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents: GRANTED as to both requests. Certified translations of the record in the Commonwealth Court shall be filed no later than August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/24/2020. (brc)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Supplemental Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/24/2020. (brc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. Responses due by 8/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing a copy of the Notice of Removal with the Court of Puerto Rico, Superior Court of San Juan filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. Responses due by 8/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. Responses due by 8/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Supplemental Motion to the Notice of Removal at Docket No. 1 re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. Responses due by 8/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/24/2020. (brc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Gilberto Santana-Sanchez on behalf of the minor Gabriel Santana-Concepcion and in representation and for the benefit of one or more similarly situated employees (Velez-Colon, Jose)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Restaurants Operators Inc. Responses due by 8/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance of Puerto Rico, Superior Court of San Juan, case number SJ2020CV03345. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6958664), filed by Restaurants Operators Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Marin-Catala, Natalia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana-Sanchez v. Operators Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Santana-Sanchez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurants Operators Inc.
Represented By: Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes
Represented By: Natalia Marin-Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?