Soto-Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: JOSE M. SOTO RIVERA and Jose M. Soto-Rivera
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 3:2020cv01372
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: NOTING Docket No. #12 INFORMATIVE motion regarding service of process. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on August 24, 2020. (ASE)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding certified mail return receipts filed by Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga on behalf of Jose M. Soto-Rivera Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, certified mail return receipts)(Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 10), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 20-1372 (CVR). Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 08/07/2020. (ft)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #9 "Informative Motion." Upon the parties' consent, the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 08/06/2020. (LMR)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding consent to proceed with a US Magistrate filed by Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga on behalf of Jose M. Soto-Rivera Responses due by 8/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noting #7 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/6/2020. (ebb)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding summons served to the US District Attorney For The District of PR filed by Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga on behalf of Jose M. Soto-Rivera Responses due by 8/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, summons served to the US District Attorney For The District of Puerto Rico)(Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #4 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/4/2020. (ebb)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. The plaintiff shall, on or before Friday, August 17, 2020, also inform whether he likewise consents, as per 28 USC sec 636. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/4/2020. (ebb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding summons and complaint sent to Attorney General and Chief Regional Counsel, Region II-SS Administration filed by Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga on behalf of Jose M. Soto-Rivera Responses due by 8/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, summons to Attorney General via certified mail, #2 Exhibit II, summons to Chief Regional Counsel, Region II-SS Administration, #3 Exhibit III, certified mail receipt)(Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6966158.), filed by JOSE M. SOTO RIVERA. Service due by 10/29/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons summons Commissioner of Social Security, #4 Summons summons USA Attorney General, #5 Summons summons US District Attorney)(Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto-Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE M. SOTO RIVERA
Represented By: Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Soto-Rivera
Represented By: Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?