Flores-Collado v. Commissioner of the Social Security Adm., et.al.,
Plaintiff: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and Carol M. Flores-Collado
Petitioner: Carol M Flores
Case Number: 3:2020cv01389
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (U.S. District Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico and Attorney General of the United States). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 INFORMATIVE motion; #9 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Plaintiff's informative motion at ECF No. 8 is noted. The motion for issuance of Summons at ECF No. 9 is Granted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/23/2020. (wm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Jose Emilio Fuentes-Del Rosario on behalf of Carol M. Flores-Collado Responses due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons for District Attorney of PR, #2 Summons for US General Attorney)(Fuentes-Del Rosario, Jose)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** INFORMATIVE Motion by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Tracking) (Fuentes-Del Rosario, Jose) Modified event and title on 9/1/2020 (idg).
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits category sheet (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet) (Fuentes-Del Rosario, Jose)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6972941.) re #1 Complaint filed by Carol M. Flores-Collado, filed by Carol M. Flores-Collado. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Carol M. Flores-Collado.(Fuentes-Del Rosario, Jose)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, et.al.,COMPLAINT, filed by Carol M. Flores-Collado, re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/7/2020. (arg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued in Social Security Case as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by Jose Emilio Fuentes-Del Rosario on behalf of Carol M Flores. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Fuentes-Del Rosario, Jose)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, filed by Carol M Flores. Service due by 11/4/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeal Council's decision)(Fuentes-Del Rosario, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores-Collado v. Commissioner of the Social Security Adm., et.al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol M. Flores-Collado
Represented By: Jose Emilio Fuentes-Del Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carol M Flores
Represented By: Jose Emilio Fuentes-Del Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?