Ferrer-Baez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Migdalia Ferrer-Baez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv01395
Filed: August 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Referring Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosoa (Docket No. 4), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 20-1395 (MEL). Judge Francisco A. Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 08/11/2020. (ft)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT. Plaintiff having consented (see paragraph 16 of the complaint), this case is referred to a magistrate judge for all proceedings, including the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/10/2020. (brc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 8, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6975443.), filed by Migdalia Ferrer-Baez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney Gen, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Social Security)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrer-Baez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Ferrer-Baez
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?