Mirabal-Catarineau v. Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ANGELES MIRABAL-CATARINEAU
Defendant: COMPANY ABC and/or CORPORATION XYZ, INSURANCE COMPANY B, JOHN DOE, JANE ROE, CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY OF PUERTO RICO, CCHPR Hospitality, LLC, MAINTENANCE COMPANY A, INSURANCE COMPANY ABC, Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC, Insurance Company A, Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC doing business as Sheraton Puerto Rico Hotel & Casino, Corporation XYZ and Company ABC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01401
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua on behalf of Defendants CCHPR Hospitality, LLC, Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC.(Marmol-Lantigua, Hector)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua on behalf of CCHPR Hospitality, LLC (Marmol-Lantigua, Hector)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Notice of Appearance. Appearance is NOTED. Extension of time is GRANTED. Answer deadline is extended until October 9, 2020. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/09/2020. (brc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC (Marmol-Lantigua, Hector)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/12/2020. (brc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CCHPR Hospitality, LLC, CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY OF PUERTO RICO, Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Manuel Cobian-Roig on behalf of ANGELES MIRABAL-CATARINEAU Responses due by 8/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Cobian-Roig, Manuel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6977806.), filed by ANGELES MIRABAL-CATARINEAU. Service due by 11/9/2020, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Cobian-Roig, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirabal-Catarineau v. Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPANY ABC and/or CORPORATION XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSURANCE COMPANY B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCHPR Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINTENANCE COMPANY A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSURANCE COMPANY ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheraton Puerto Rico Management, LLC doing business as Sheraton Puerto Rico Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELES MIRABAL-CATARINEAU
Represented By: Manuel Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?