In Re: Organic Power LLC
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellee: Organic Power LLC
Appellant: Small Business Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv01411
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED as requested. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/08/2020. (brc)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/08/2020. (brc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for extension of time filed by Michael S. Tye on behalf of Small Business Administration Responses due by 10/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tye, Michael)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Michael S. Tye on behalf of Small Business Administration Responses due by 10/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tye, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED TRANSMITTAL OF INFORMATIVE REPORT TO THE DISTRICT COURT FROM THE U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (acbk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSMITTAL TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL from Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (acbk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 80, #3 Order dkt 81, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Organic Power LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Organic Power LLC
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera
Represented By: Michael S. Tye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?