La Merced Limited Partnership, SE v. OSP Consortium LLC
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellee: OSP Consortium LLC
Appellant: La Merced Limited Partnership, SE
Case Number: 3:2020cv01412
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Supplemental Certification for Transmittal of Incomplete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Brief due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (acbk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Incomplete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Brief due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(acbk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 4), this case has been transferred to the docket of Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, who has consented to the transfer and presides over related case 20-cv-1321-GAG (see, 20-cv-1321 at Docket No. 20). Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2020. (gr) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct entry text (gr).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. This case is transferred to the docket of Chief Judge Gelpi, who has consented to the transfer. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 8/19/2020. (gr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill E. Kelso on behalf of US Trustee (Kelso, Jill)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by La Merced Limited Partnership, SE. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 195, #3 Order dkt 196, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Merced Limited Partnership, SE v. OSP Consortium LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Represented By: Jill E. Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OSP Consortium LLC
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: La Merced Limited Partnership, SE
Represented By: Nelson Robles-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?