Reyes-Colon v. Banco Popular de Puerto Rico et al
Appellee: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico and Popular Auto
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellant: Edgar A Reyes Colon and Edgar A. Reyes-Colon
Case Number: 3:2020cv01417
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER striking #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties shall only make filings in the docket of the lead case: Civ. No. 20-1355 (JAG). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/5/2020. (ERC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 ***STRICKEN AS PER D.E 8 ORDER*** MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2020 to file Appellants Initial BriefAND CLARIFICATION REQUEST filed by Jose A. Pagan-Nieves on behalf of Edgar A. Reyes-Colon Responses due by 10/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pagan-Nieves, Jose) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mg).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Copy of ORDER granting 9 Motion to transfer case. This case (Civ. No. 20-1355 JAG) is hereby consolidated with Civ. No. 20-1417 PAD with Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez's consent. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/27/2020. (ERC) . Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/27/2020.(mg) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 08/26/2020 (Docket No. 4) and the Order entered by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory in Civil Case 20-1355 (see, Docket No. 10), this case has been consolidated with Civil Case 20-1355 (JAG) and thus transferred to the docket of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (ft)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #3 "Appellant's Notice of Related Matters and Motion to Transfer Related Matter." The case is transferred to the docket of judge Garcia-Gregory, who has consented to the transfer. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/26/2020. (MPL)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to transfer case to Case 20-01355 filed by Jose A. Pagan-Nieves on behalf of Edgar A. Reyes-Colon Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pagan-Nieves, Jose)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Edgar A Reyes Colon. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 863, #3 Order dkt 868, #4 Certified Docket_Part1, #5 Certified Docket_Part2, #6 Certified Docket_Part3, #7 Certified Docket_Part4)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes-Colon v. Banco Popular de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Represented By: Eldia M. Diaz-Olmo
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Represented By: Gerardo Pavia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Popular Auto
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Represented By: Eldia M. Diaz-Olmo
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Represented By: Gerardo Pavia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edgar A Reyes Colon
Represented By: Jose A. Pagan-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edgar A. Reyes-Colon
Represented By: Jose A. Pagan-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?