Romero-Figueroa v. Pueblo de Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: Celso Romero-Figueroa
Defendant: Pueblo de Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2020cv01421
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noted #5 Motion In Compliance; Denying #6 Motion to Leave. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/6/2020. (AGF)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Celso Romero-Figueroa. (gmm)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Celso Romero-Figueroa, Pro se. Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gmm)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Letter Motion In Compliance filed by Celso Romero-Figueroa, Pro se in the Spanish Language. Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(gmm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING the instant case. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/19/2020. (AGF)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This complaint is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff seeks appellate review from this Court under PR R Crim P 185. This court does not act as a territorial appeals tribunal. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/19/2020. (AGF)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE PLEADING. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/8/2020. (gmm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pueblo de Puerto Rico filed by Celso Romero-Figueroa, Pro se in the Spanish Language. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1, #2 Attachment #2, #3 Attachment #3, #4 Attachment #4, #5 Attachment #5, #6 Attachment #6, #7 Envelope)(gmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #8 PSLC Transmittal Memorandum) (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero-Figueroa v. Pueblo de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celso Romero-Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?