Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. v. MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Plaintiff: Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc.
Defendant: MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01440
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER RULE 12(B)(1) as to MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #4 "Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint." Defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2020. (ebb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #5 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2020. (ebb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edgardo Cartagena-Santiago on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Cartagena-Santiago, Edgardo)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (vdm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6994162.), filed by Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc.. Service due by 11/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Normative Letter, #3 Exhibit Contract between PHG and MSO, #4 Exhibit Selection of Arbitrator, #5 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons MSO)(Lopez-Romo, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. v. MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Represented By: Edgardo Cartagena-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc.
Represented By: Francisco M. Lopez-Romo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?