Vazquez-Ortiz v. One to Seven, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz
Defendant: Tomas Padilla, One to Seven, Inc., Defendants DEF and ABC Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2020cv01463
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Maralyssa Alvarez-Sanchez on behalf of Defendants One to Seven, Inc., Tomas Padilla.(Alvarez-Sanchez, Maralyssa)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 4, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz filed by Juan F. Santos-Caraballo on behalf of One to Seven, Inc., Tomas Padilla Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Santos-Caraballo, Juan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz upon Tomas Padilla served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Fagot-Diaz, Jose)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz upon One to Seven, Inc. served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Fagot-Diaz, Jose)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to One to Seven, Inc., Tomas Padilla (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young. (arg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet re: #3 Notice of Defective Filing, #1 Complaint, filed by Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz filed by Jose G. Fagot-Diaz on behalf of Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #3 , #1 ) (Fagot-Diaz, Jose) Modified to change event on 9/9/2020 (rim).
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category Sheet(JS44) is incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/10/2020. (arg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons for Tomas Padilla re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz filed by Jose G. Fagot-Diaz on behalf of Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued for Defendant Tomas Padilla)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Fagot-Diaz, Jose) Modified to change event on 9/9/2020 (rim).
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7010928.), filed by Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz. Service due by 12/7/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to be Served on One to Seven, Inc, #4 Summons Summons to be Served on Tomas Padilla)(Fagot-Diaz, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez-Ortiz v. One to Seven, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Padilla
Represented By: Maralyssa Alvarez-Sanchez
Represented By: Juan F. Santos-Caraballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One to Seven, Inc.
Represented By: Maralyssa Alvarez-Sanchez
Represented By: Juan F. Santos-Caraballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovelisse Vazquez-Ortiz
Represented By: Jose G. Fagot-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?