Kingtom Aluminio SLR v. Air Master Windows and Doors
Plaintiff: KINGTOM ALUMINIO SLR
Defendant: Air Master Windows and Doors
Case Number: 3:2020cv01465
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until November 25, 2020 to Plead or Otherwise Defend filed by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of Air Master Windows and Doors Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vidal-Font, Jean)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kingtom Aluminio SLR upon Air Master Windows and Doors served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (mg)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Air Master Windows and Doors. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Summons for Issuance as to Air Master Windows and Doors filed by Maria Soledad Lozada-Figueroa on behalf of Kingtom Aluminio SLR Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lozada-Figueroa, Maria) Modified on 10/1/2020 (to edit docket title and event. mg).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Master Windows and Doors ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7012011.), filed by KINGTOM ALUMINIO SLR. Service due by 12/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lozada-Figueroa, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingtom Aluminio SLR v. Air Master Windows and Doors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Master Windows and Doors
Represented By: Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGTOM ALUMINIO SLR
Represented By: Maria Soledad Lozada-Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?