Bruno-Concepcion v. Banco Popular Puerto Rico
Appellant: Margarita Bruno Concepcion and Margarita Bruno-Concepcion
Interested Party: US Trustee and Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellee: Banco Popular Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2020cv01473
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION of Supplemental Transmittal of Incomplete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Margarita Bruno-Concepcion. Appellant Brief due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Certification of Direct Appeal, #2 Opposition to Motion to Certify Direct Appeal, #3 Certified Docket)(babk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Incomplete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Margarita Bruno-Concepcion. Appellant Brief due by 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket)(babk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Request of Certification of Appeal to the US Court of Appeals for the 1st filed by Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez on behalf of Margarita Bruno-Concepcion Responses due by 10/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for certification action of appeal to the US Court of Appeal 1st Cir)(Trujillo-Gonzalez, Maximiliano)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (arg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Margarita Bruno Concepcion. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 50, #3 Order dkt 48, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruno-Concepcion v. Banco Popular Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Margarita Bruno Concepcion
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Margarita Bruno-Concepcion
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Alejandro Oliveras-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Popular Puerto Rico
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?