United States of America v. The Foreign Representatives
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellee: The Foreign Representatives
Appellant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv01475
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by United States of America. (Bourget, Boris)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Transmittal Form filed by United States of America, by The Foreign Representatives. . (Berman, Steven) Modified on 9/30/2020 to edit docket text (rom).
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal filed by The Foreign Representatives Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Transmittal Form filed by United States of America filed by The Foreign Representatives. (Berman, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Boris Bourget on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 10/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bourget, Boris)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #4 Notice of Appearance (Golden, Jennifer)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 09/23/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Y. Golden on behalf of United States of America (Golden, Jennifer)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to United States' Motion for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal as to #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Transmittal Form filed by United States of America filed by Steven M. Berman on behalf of The Foreign Representatives Responses due by 10/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Berman, Steven)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (arg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 39, #3 Motion for Leave to Appeal, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Foreign Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Foreign Representatives
Represented By: Steven M. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Bourget
Represented By: Jennifer Y. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?