Electronic Games, Inc., et al v. The Puerto Rico Tourism Company, et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Colon Santiago, Ramon Rivera Figueroa, C & K ENTERTAINMENT, CORP., Felix A. Camacho Mena, Computer & Games, Inc., LROD, Inc., RBS Entertainments Group, Corp., Mario Bravo Maisonave, Empresas WW, Inc., C & R Entertainment Games, Corp., DOBLE SEIS SPORT, TV, INC., W Games, Corp., AVENUE AUTO GROUP, CORP., QUE MANERA, INC., Teddy Berrios Rivera, Ricardos Entertainment, Corp., Zayas Enterteiment, Corp., RE RODRIGUEZ ENTERPRISE AMUSEMENT COIN MACHINE, INC., SLROD, INC.,, L & C ENTERTAINMENT GAMES, CORP., Electronic Games, Inc., JL Entertainment, Corp., EY ENTERTAINMENT, INC., Raul A. Sanchez Melo, Carlos Vega Gonzalez, Ramon Rivera-Figueroa, Carlos Vega-Gonzalez, Mario Bravo-Maisonave, Antonio Colon-Santiago, Ricardo's Entertainment, Corp., SLROD, Inc., Felix A. Camacho-Mena, Raul A. Sanchez-Melo, Teddy Berrios-Rivera, Doble Seis Sport TV, Inc. and L & J Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: THE GAMING COMMISION OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO, THE PUERTO RICO TOURISM COMPANY and The Gaming Commission of The Government of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2020cv01478
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/28/2020. (EES)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs filed by Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting certified translation of Spanish language Exhibit re: #1 Complaint, filed by L & C Entertainment Games, Corp., RBS Entertainments Group, Corp., L & J Entertainment, Inc., Carlos Vega-Gonzalez, Ramon Rivera-Figueroa, SLROD, Inc., Avenue Auto Group, Corp., Mario Bravo-Maisonave, Teddy Berrios-Rivera, W Games, Corp., Ricardo's Entertainment, Corp., Raul A. Sanchez-Melo, JL Entertainment, Corp., LROD, Inc., Computer & Games, Inc., Zayas Enterteiment, Corp., EY Entertainment, Inc., Antonio Colon-Santiago, RE Rodriguez Enterprise Amusement Coin Machine, Inc., Electronic Games, Inc., Empresas WW, Inc., Doble Seis Sport TV, Inc., Que Manera, Inc., C & K Entertainment, Corp., C & R Entertainment Games, Corp., Felix A. Camacho-Mena filed by Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified Translation)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/28/2020. (EES)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Gaming Commission of The Government of Puerto Rico and The Puerto Rico Tourism Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified to change capital letters on 9/17/2020 (rim).
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Gaming Commission of The Government of Puerto Rico and The Puerto Rico Tourism Company, ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7020286.), filed by All Plaintiffs. Service due by 12/15/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Regulation 9174, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons #1, #5 Summons #2)(Gueits-Ortiz, Jose) Modified to add filers, change capital letters and edit docket text on 9/17/2020 (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Games, Inc., et al v. The Puerto Rico Tourism Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Colon Santiago
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Rivera Figueroa
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & K ENTERTAINMENT, CORP.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix A. Camacho Mena
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Computer & Games, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LROD, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RBS Entertainments Group, Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Bravo Maisonave
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empresas WW, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & R Entertainment Games, Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOBLE SEIS SPORT, TV, INC.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W Games, Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVENUE AUTO GROUP, CORP.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUE MANERA, INC.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Berrios Rivera
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardos Entertainment, Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayas Enterteiment, Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE RODRIGUEZ ENTERPRISE AMUSEMENT COIN MACHINE, INC.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLROD, INC.,
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L & C ENTERTAINMENT GAMES, CORP.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL Entertainment, Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EY ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul A. Sanchez Melo
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Vega Gonzalez
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Rivera-Figueroa
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Vega-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Bravo-Maisonave
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Colon-Santiago
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo's Entertainment, Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLROD, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix A. Camacho-Mena
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul A. Sanchez-Melo
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Berrios-Rivera
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doble Seis Sport TV, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L & J Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GAMING COMMISION OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PUERTO RICO TOURISM COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gaming Commission of The Government of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?