Ramirez-Garcia et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Community Property Regime Constituted by Naishaly Ramirez Garcia and Juan Carlos Perez, Naishary Ramirez, Juan Carlos Perez Camacho, Juan Carlos Perez-Camacho, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Ramirez and Naishary Ramirez-Garcia
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Stephen Muldrow, Ken Cucinelli, Brett Rinegart, William P. Barr, Attorney General for the District of Puerto Rico, Deliana Gonzalez, Attorney General for the United States, Secretary Chad F Wolf and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 3:2020cv01479
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to William P. Barr, Ken Cucinelli, Deliana Gonzalez, Stephen Muldrow, Brett Rinegart, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) Modified applicable party on 11/6/2020 (idg). Modified on 11/9/2020 to remove restricion(ab).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Issuance of Summons: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/27/2020. (ab)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Garcia-Miranda, Maria) Modified restriction and filers per request on 10/6/2020 (idg).
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Miranda, Maria) ***MODIFIED on 10/6/2020 to remove restriction. Standing Order No. 9 states that the Motion to Restrict... "shall be open to public inspection..."*** (idg).
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Garcia-Miranda, Maria) Modified on 10/7/2020 to remove restriction and edit docket text (ab).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (arg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7020500.), filed by Community Property Regime Constituted by Naishaly Ramirez Garcia and Juan Carlos Perez, Juan Carlos Perez Camacho, Naishary Ramirez. Service due by 12/15/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-Garcia et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Muldrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cucinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Rinegart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General for the District of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deliana Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General for the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Property Regime Constituted by Naishaly Ramirez Garcia and Juan Carlos Perez
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naishary Ramirez
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Perez Camacho
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Perez-Camacho
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Represented By: Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Perez-Ramirez
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Represented By: Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naishary Ramirez-Garcia
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Represented By: Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?