Mendoza-Garcia v. USA
Petitioner: Luciano Mendoza-Garcia
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv01485
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 7, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 16-cr-656 ADC) filed by Luciano Mendoza-Garcia filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 11/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bauza, Mariana)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The government is hereby ORDERED to respond to the petition within 45 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/22/2020.(wm)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support Re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 16-cr-656 ADC) filed by Luciano Mendoza-Garcia, pro se. (idg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 16-cr-656) filed by Luciano Mendoza-Garcia, pro se. Responses due by 9/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(idg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza-Garcia v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luciano Mendoza-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?