Torres-Segui v. YRC, Inc. and/or YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Torres-Segui
Defendant: YRC, Inc. and/or YRC Worldwide, Inc., Insurance Company XYZ, John Doe, New Penn Motor Express LLC, Company ABC, YRC Worldwide Inc. and YRC, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01504
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to YRC Worldwide Inc. filed by YRC Worldwide Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsworn Statement)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendants New Penn Motor Express LLC, YRC, Inc..(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendant New Penn Motor Express LLC.(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED. Answer due November 20, 2020. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/19/2020. (brc)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for extension of time until November 20, 2020 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of New Penn Motor Express LLC, YRC Worldwide Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pedro Torres-Segui upon New Penn Motor Express LLC served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020; YRC, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Penn Motor Express LLC, YRC, Inc. and/or YRC Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7030027.), filed by Pedro Torres-Segui. Service due by 12/28/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rivera-Rios, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres-Segui v. YRC, Inc. and/or YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC, Inc. and/or YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Motor Express LLC
Represented By: Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez
Represented By: Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez
Represented By: Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Torres-Segui
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?