Ortiz-Aponte v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Erika Ortiz-Aponte
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv01505
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER #8 INFORMATIVE motion. NOTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/5/2020. (wm)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Mailing of Summons filed by Raymond Rivera-Esteves on behalf of Erika Ortiz-Aponte Responses due by 10/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons Mailing Receipts)(Rivera-Esteves, Raymond)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion In Compliance. NOTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/30/2020. (wm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Motion In Compliance Submitting Correct Summons filed by Raymond Rivera-Esteves on behalf of Erika Ortiz-Aponte. Responses due by 10/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons (1) Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons (2) Summons Commissioner SS, #3 Summons (3) AG Barr)(Rivera-Esteves, Raymond) Modified typographical error on 9/30/2020 (idg).
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Summons submitted is not in the form prescribed by U.S. District Court. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/29/2020. (arg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Rivera-Esteves on behalf of Erika Ortiz-Aponte (Rivera-Esteves, Raymond)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7030753.), filed by Erika Ortiz-Aponte. Service due by 12/28/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 1, #2 Category Sheet Exhibit 2, #3 Summons Exhibit 3 Summons Commissioner, #4 Summons Exhibit 4 Summons AG, #5 Summons Exhibit 5 Summons US Atty)(Rivera-Esteves, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz-Aponte v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Ortiz-Aponte
Represented By: Raymond Rivera-Esteves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?