Tangiers Global, LLC v. VGambling, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tangiers Global, LLC
Defendant: VGAMBLING, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01520
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 37 JUDGMENT is entered DISMISSING this action WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/15/2021. (mrr)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Stipulation of Dismissal. Judgment of dismissal with prejudice shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/15/2021. (mrr)
June 11, 2021 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by All Parties (Silva-Wiscovich, Guillermo) Modified docket text and add filer on 6/14/2021 (rim).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: By June 17, 2021, the parties shall comply with the Order at Docket 33 which required them to file a stipulation of dismissal implementing their settlement agreement. Failure to comply with this new deadline may result in dismissal of the action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/3/2021. (mrr)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER noted #32 Status Report. Stipulation of voluntary dismissal due by 6/1/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/3/2021. (mrr)
April 30, 2021 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT by Tangiers Global, LLC. (Hunter, Mark)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER noted and granted #30 Motion for extension of time. Stipulation of voluntary dismissal or status report due by 4/30/2021 . Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 4/19/2021. (mrr)
April 16, 2021 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for extension of time to For Final Period Regarding Settlement filed by Gabriel A. Penagaricano on behalf of VGAMBLING, INC. Responses due by 4/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Penagaricano, Gabriel)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for extension of time. The parties shall report on the results of their settlement efforts by 4/16/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 3/18/2021. (mrr)
March 17, 2021 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by All Parties. Responses due by 3/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Penagaricano, Gabriel) Modified to add filer on 3/18/2021 (rim).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Continue. The parties shall move for dismissal of the action or file a status report by March 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/1/2021. (mrr)
January 31, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Continue Requesting Brief Period to Explore Settlement Negotiations filed by All Parties. Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Penagaricano, Gabriel) Modified to add filer on 2/1/2021 (rim).
December 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark David Hunter on behalf of Tangiers Global, LLC (Hunter, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/16/2020. (mrr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 23 Motion to allow MARK D. HUNTER to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7085291) filed by Guillermo J. Silva-Wiscovich on behalf of Tangiers Global, LLC Responses due by 11/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE)(Silva-Wiscovich, Guillermo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Gabriel A. Penagaricano on behalf of Defendant VGAMBLING, INC..(Penagaricano, Gabriel)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for extension of time. Defendant shall plead or otherwise defend by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/28/2020. (mrr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time to ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by Gabriel A. Penagaricano on behalf of VGAMBLING, INC. Responses due by 11/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Penagaricano, Gabriel)
October 26, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #19 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Nevada Counsel Maximiliano D. Couvillier III to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed using another counsel's login and password.*** (mcm)
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed using another counsel's login and password.*** MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Nevada Counsel Maximiliano D. Couvillier III to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff filed by Guillermo J. Silva-Wiscovich on behalf of Tangiers Global, LLC Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Silva-Wiscovich, Guillermo) Modified on 10/26/2020 (mcm).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/23/2020. (mrr)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7061456) filed by Gabriel A. Penagaricano on behalf of VGAMBLING, INC. Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Penagaricano, Gabriel)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo J. Silva-Wiscovich on behalf of Tangiers Global, LLC (Silva-Wiscovich, Guillermo)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Maier terminated. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/15/2020. (mrr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jason Maier filed by Jason Maier on behalf of VGAMBLING, INC. Responses due by 10/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mcm)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Gabriel A. Penagaricano on behalf of VGAMBLING, INC. Responses due by 10/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Penagaricano, Gabriel) Modified on 10/8/2020 to correct event and title (mcm).
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: case transferred from the District of Nevada. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2020. (mcm) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/6/2020 to add PHV appearance cost) (mcm).
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-01434. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation to Transfer Case to District of Puerto Rico. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Transfer Venue, by Defendant VGambling, Inc. (Maier, Jason) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tangiers Global, LLC re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint. Defendant served on 8/11/2020. (Couvillier, Maximiliano) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (SLD). [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Deeming #5 Order to Show Cause Satisfied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Tangiers Global, LLC. (Couvillier, Maximiliano) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why this Case Should Not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction - Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to VGAMBLING, INC. (HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TANGIERS GLOBAL, LLC,. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Couvillier, Maximiliano) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VGAMBLING, INC. n/k/a ESPORTS ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6110005) by TANGIERS GLOBAL, LLC,. Proof of service due by 11/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Couvillier, Maximiliano) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangiers Global, LLC v. VGambling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGAMBLING, INC.
Represented By: Jason Maier
Represented By: Jonathan Uretsky
Represented By: Gabriel A. Penagaricano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangiers Global, LLC
Represented By: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Represented By: Guillermo J. Silva-Wiscovich
Represented By: Mark David Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?