Inc. et al v. Urban Edge Caguas LP
Plaintiff: Vota Inc. and Urban Edge Properties
Defendant: Urban Edge Caguas LP
Case Number: 3:2020cv01634
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/30/2021. (cmd)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Urban Edge Properties, Urban Edge Caguas LP. Defendants' motion to dismiss at ECF No. 15 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Clerk of Court shall enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice. All pending motions are thus MOOT. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/30/2021.(wm)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER noted #14 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/28/2021. (wm)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #21 Motion for Leave to File. Leave to file is Granted. Reply was filed at ECF No. 22. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/7/2021. (wm)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER finding as moot #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/20/2021. (wm)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #12 Motion to Set Aside. Noted and Granted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/20/2021. (wm)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #10 INFORMATIVE motion. Noted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/20/2021. (wm)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants Re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Urban Edge Properties, Urban Edge Caguas LP filed by All Defendants. (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss at Docket No. 20 filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of Urban Edge Caguas LP, Urban Edge Properties Responses due by 2/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Urban Edge Properties, Urban Edge Caguas LP filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of All Defendants (Peirats, Jorge)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/09/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Urban Edge Properties, Urban Edge Caguas LP filed by Atabey Y. Lamela-Gandia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #17 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to correct and re-file.*** (idg)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to correct and re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of All Defendants (Peirats, Jorge) Modified to file in error on 1/22/2021 (idg).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #16 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Urban Edge Caguas LP, Urban Edge Properties (Peirats, Jorge) Modified to file in error on 1/20/2021 (idg).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement)(Martinez-Casado, Maria)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INFORMATIVE Motion, RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #13 MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Vota Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Martinez-Casado, Maria) Modified event and title on 1/20/2021 (idg).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Atabey Y. Lamela-Gandia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Set Aside Summons and Grant Waiver re: #10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Waiver of the Service of Summons filed by Urban Edge Properties, Urban Edge Caguas LP, #9 MOTION filed by Vota Inc. filed by Atabey Y. Lamela-Gandia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Reply containing PDF waiver of summons)(Related document(s) #10 , #9 ) (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Vota Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Waiver of the Service of Summons filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Waiver of Service and Copy of Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Waivers of Service)(Martinez-Casado, Maria)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to Certify Service of Summons on the Parties; AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Urban Edge Caguas LP, #2 Affidavit Urban Properties) (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey) Modified event and title on 12/29/2020 (idg).
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Atabey Y. Lamela-Gandia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Urban Edge Caguas LP, Urban Edge Properties. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vdm)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits summons to be issued by All Plaintiffs (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey) Modified event on 11/16/2020 (idg).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits summons to be issued by All Plaintiffs (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey) Modified title on 11/16/2020 (idg).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filings Exhibits Category Sheet by All Plaintiffs (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey) Modified title on 11/16/2020 (idg).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey) Modified title on 11/16/2020 (idg).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Vota Inc. v Urban Edge Caguas, Urban Edge Properties against Vota Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7084731.), filed by Vota Inc.. Service due by 2/10/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease Contract, #2 Supplement Vota Inc Bankruptcy Automatic Stay)(Lamela-Gandia, Atabey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inc. et al v. Urban Edge Caguas LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vota Inc.
Represented By: Atabey Y. Lamela-Gandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urban Edge Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Edge Caguas LP
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Represented By: Jorge I. Peirats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?