Novus Inc. et al v. DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E. et al
Plaintiff: Novus Inc. and Parfois PR LLC
Defendant: DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E, DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E and DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01638
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Referring Judge: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 92 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/29/2021.(LMR)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Granting #90 "Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to All Remaining Defendants." Plaintiffs claims against co-defendants DDR Del Sol, LLC, S.E.; DDR Norte, LLC, S.E.; DDR Rio Hondo, LLC, S.E.; DDR Escorial, LLC, S.E.; DDR Isabela, LLC, S.E., and DDR Cayey LLC, S.E. are dismissed with prejudice without the imposition of costs or attorney's fees on any of the parties. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/29/2021. (LMR)
July 28, 2021 Filing 90 MOTION to dismiss Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to all Reminding Defendants as to DDR Cayey LLC S.E, DDR Del Norte LLC S.E, DDR Escorial LLC S.E., DDR Isabela LLC S.E, DDR Rio Hondo LLC S.E, DDR del Sol LLC. S.E. filed by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
July 16, 2021 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Status Conference held on 7/16/2021. Present: attorney Alexandra C. Casellas on behalf of plaintiffs and attorney Alberto Estrella on behalf of defendants. Court requested an update of the status of the case. Attorney Casellas informed the parties have reached an agreement in principle but need to finalize several matters before the agreement can be executed. Accordingly, she requested the case be stayed for an additional week, to allow the parties time to finalize good faith settlement efforts. Attorney Estrella confirmed the information and joined the request. The court granted the requested extension, to expire on July 23, 2021, and set a follow up Status Conference for July 27, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. via VTC-PAD. If an agreement is reached before said date, the parties shall file the appropriate motions. Hearing set for 2:00 p.m. Hearing held at 1:56 p.m. Hearing ended at 2:01 p.m. (LMR)
June 25, 2021 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Status Conference held on 6/25/2021 Present: attorney Alexandra C. Casellas on behalf of plaintiffs and attorney Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia and Alberto Estrella on behalf of defendants. Court requested an update of the status of the case since the last Conference. Attorney Casellas informed she received a settlement offer this morning. The offer was forwarded to her client for analysis and discussion. Attorney Gonzalez confirmed the information and added it is a reasonable offer that should dispose of the case. So, she requested the case be stayed until July 15, 2021, to allow the parties time to conduct good faith settlement efforts. Attorney Estrella added the term requested is based on the fact that the tendered offer would dispose of this case while allowing the parties to execute agreements in cases that have expired as of today. The court granted the request to stay and set a follow up Status Conference for July 16, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. via VTC-PAD. If an agreement is reached before said date, the parties shall file the appropriate motions. The parties were also reminded that if no agreement is reached, the case will proceed without a jury and the outstanding claims will be tried by the court which allows some flexibility absent the need to coordinate logistics associated with jury selection in light of the ongoing pandemic. Hearing set for 2:00 p.m. Hearing held at 2:01 p.m. Hearing ended at 2:11 p.m. (LMR)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Granting #86 "Motion For Leave to File Document in Excess of the Page Limit under L. Cv. R. 7(d)." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/8/2021. (ebb)
June 7, 2021 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages NOVUS' Sur-Reply at Dkt. 85 filed by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
June 7, 2021 Filing 85 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to the Amended Complaint filed by DDR Rio Hondo LLC S.E, DDR Del Norte LLC S.E, DDR del Sol LLC. S.E., DDR Isabela LLC S.E, DDR Cayey LLC S.E, DDR Escorial LLC S.E. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
June 2, 2021 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Status Conference held via teleconference on 6/2/2021. Present: attorneys Alexandra C. Casellas and Eric Perez Ochoa on behalf of plaintiffs and attorney Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of defendants. Case background, status, the parties' respective legal theories, and all outstanding issues (including parallel litigation between the parties in state court) were discussed at length. Attorney Perez informed that a settlement offer was tendered to defendants last week. Attorney Gonzalez confirmed receipt of the offer. The court encouraged the parties to engage in good faith negotiations while noting that the case will not be stayed. A follow up Status Conference will be held on June 25, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. If the parties wish to provide an update to the court before the conference, they may do so, by way of a joint motion. Hearing set for 2:00 p.m.Hearing held at 2:13 p.m. Hearing ended at 2:42 p.m. (LMR)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: A Status Conference is set for June 2, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. via teleconference before Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Dial-in information and instructions will be sent by email to record counsel in due course. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/27/2021.(LMR)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Granting #80 "Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/27/2021. (ebb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 81 REPLY to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Re: #69 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC filed by DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel) Modified on 5/27/2021 to correct event title (mcm).
May 26, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Document in excess of page limit filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Responses due by 6/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
May 26, 2021 Filing 79 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Supplemental Motion re: #11 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand, 78 Order on Motion to Restrict, 75 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Motion In Compliance filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Responses due by 6/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease DDR del Sol and Novus, #2 Exhibit Lease DDR del Sol and Novus (Bakers), #3 Exhibit Lease DDR Escorial and Novus (Bakers), #4 Exhibit Lease DDR Cayey and Novus (Bakers), #5 Exhibit Lease DDR Rio Hondo and Novus (Baker), #6 Exhibit Lease DDR Norte and Novus, #7 Exhibit Lease DDR Rio Hondo and Novus, #8 Exhibit Lease DDR Del Sol and Parfois)(Related document(s) #11 , 78 , 75 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Granting #77 "Motion Requesting Leave For Restricted Filing Pursuant to Local Rule 5(B) and Standing Order #9." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/26/2021. (ebb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 77 MOTION to Restrict Document (lease agreements to be filed today) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Responses due by 6/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: To facilitate review of the "Motion to Strike Jury Demand" at Docket No. 11, defendants shall supplement the request by submitting for the record, not later than May 26, 2021, a complete copy of all the agreements referred to in their motion. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/19/2021. (LMR)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Granting #71 "Motion for Leave to File Reply and Extension of Time." Reply due by May 26, 2021. Any surreply may be filed by June 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/12/2021. (LMR)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Granting #68 "Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/12/2021. (LMR)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Granting #70 "Motion for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to Co-defendant Gator Palma Real, LLC." Plaintiffs' claims against Gator Palma Real LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/12/20021. (LMR)
May 12, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, MOTION for extension of time until 5/28/2021 to file reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Responses due by 5/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
May 10, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION to dismiss voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
May 7, 2021 Filing 69 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to the Amended Complaint filed by DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E, DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
May 7, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Noting #66 "Notice Submitting Certified Translation of Puerto Rico Supreme Court Decision." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/27/2021. (ebb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE Submitting Certified Translation by DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Granting #64 "Gator's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint." Response due by 5/21/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/19/2021. (ebb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 64 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/21/2021 to File Answer to Amended Complaint re: #48 Amended Complaint filed by Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E Responses due by 5/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Granting #62 "Consented Motion for Extension of Time to File Written Opposition to Motion to Dismiss." Opposition due by 5/7/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/9/2021. (ebb)
April 8, 2021 Filing 62 First MOTION for extension of time until May 7, 2021 filed by Glorimar Irene-Abel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Irene-Abel, Glorimar)
April 8, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Noting #50 "Plaintiffs' Notice of Errata Relating to Their Amended Complaint." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/7/2021. (LMR)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Noting #49 "Plaintiffs' Notice of Mootness of Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss..." See Order of even date. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/7/2021. (LMR)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Noting #47 "Supplemental Motion." See Order of even date. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/7/2021. (LMR)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #42 "Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim." An Amended Complaint was filed at Docket No. 48. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/7/2021. (LMR)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Granting #53 "Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and to File Documents in the Spanish Language." Certified translations due by May 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/7/2021. (LMR)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Granting #52 "Gator's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint." Response due by 4/21/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/7/2021. (LMR)
April 7, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to the Amended Complaint filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Responses due by 4/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
April 7, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Document in excess of page limit filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Responses due by 4/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for extension of time until 4/21/2021 to file response to amended complaint filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E Responses due by 4/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 51 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Change of Name filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E Responses due by 4/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
March 25, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs Notice of Errata Relating to their Amended Complaint Re: #48 Amended Complaint filed by Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC filed by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
March 24, 2021 Filing 49 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss at Dkt. 42 filed by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
March 24, 2021 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
March 22, 2021 Filing 47 Supplemental Motion Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Noting #45 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/15/2021. (ebb)
March 15, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re: #42 "Renewed Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof." Plaintiffs shall respond by 3/24/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/12/2021. (ebb)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Granting #41 "Motion For Leave to File Excess Pages and to File Documents in the Spanish Language." Certified translations due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/11/2021. (ebb)
March 10, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
March 10, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Extension of Time to file Certified Translations filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel). Added MOTION for extension of time on 3/11/2021 (mcm).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Because the parties' efforts to resolve this case through mediation were fruitless, the stay ordered at Docket No. 21 is LIFTED. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by March 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/26/2021.(LMR)
February 25, 2021 Filing 39 Minute Entry for mediation proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. (nv)
February 24, 2021 Filing 38 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION Withdrawing Consent to Court Annexed Mediation and Lift of Stay, MOTION to Withdraw filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E Responses due by 3/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Restrict. Filing at Docket No. 34 will be restricted with access only to the parties and the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on February 24, 2021. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
February 24, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Restrict Document (filings related to mediation) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Bifurcate. The mediation session scheduled for February 25, 2021 will be held between Plaintiffs and Defendant DDR Palma Real LLC (Gator). On or before February 26, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file a joint motion with the remaining defendants suggesting at least three (3) dates during the first two weeks of March for a third mediation hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 2/23/2021. (nv)
February 23, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Bifurcate Mediation filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC Responses due by 3/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perez-Ochoa, Eric) Modified document and attachment security to case participant on 2/24/2021, upon USMJ GLS' req.(kd).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Noted #32 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 2/18/2021. (nv)
February 17, 2021 Filing 32 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler: Mediation Hearing set for 2/25/2021 09:30 AM in VTC Bridge GLS before Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. (hgp)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. The parties are ordered to keep all mediation proceedings, including any written and oral communications made by the parties and the Court, in strict confidentiality pursuant to the requirements of Local Rule 83J(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 02/09/2021.(Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 2/3/2021. (nv)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER noted #25 Motion In Compliance Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 2/3/2021. (nv)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Restrict Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 2/3/2021. (nv)
February 2, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Document in excess of page limit filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
February 2, 2021 Filing 25 ***EX-PARTE*** Motion In Compliance (filing confidential mediation statement) as to 23 Order, filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet 4)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
February 2, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Restrict Document Confidential Mediation Statement filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. First Mediation Session to be held on February 9, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. A representative of each party with binding authority to settle the matter should be present. Pursuant to Local Rule 83J(e)(2)(B), the parties are ordered to submit their Confidential Mediation Statements by February 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on January 25, 2021.(Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
January 25, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings Confidential Mediation Statements due by 2/2/2021. First Mediation Session set for 2/9/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on January 25, 2021.(Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Noting #20 "Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss." But considering that the parties will engage in mediation and the case is stayed for that purpose, the motion to dismiss at Docket No. 15 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE of being refiled, if warranted, upon conclusion of all mediation efforts. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/22/2020. (LMR)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #19 "Joint Motion Requesting Court Annexed Mediation Under L.Civ.R. 83J(b)(3) and for Stay of Proceedings Pending Mediation Efforts." The case is referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler for mediation. The Magistrate Judge is at liberty to set mediation session(s) as she deems appropriate, and to request any and all necessary materials she considers necessary for that purpose. The case is stayed pending mediation. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/22/2020.(LMR)
January 21, 2021 Filing 20 First MOTION for extension of time until February 20, 2021 to response to the motion to dismiss and/or amend its allegations filed by Glorimar Irene-Abel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Irene-Abel, Glorimar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION Joint Motion Requesting Court-Annexed Mediation Under L. Civ. R. 83J(b)(3), and for Stay of Proceedings Pending Mediation Efforts filed by Glorimar Irene-Abel on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 2/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Irene-Abel, Glorimar) Modified on 1/20/2021 to add filers and edit title (mcm).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Noting #17 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2021. (ebb)
January 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Glorimar Irene-Abel on behalf of Novus Inc. (Irene-Abel, Glorimar)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #14 "Motion For Leave to File Excess Pages and to File Documents in the Spanish Language." Certified Translations due by February 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/8/2021. (ebb)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and to file Excess Pages, MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #12 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer." Appearing defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/18/2020. (LMR)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/7/2021 to File Answer to the complaint filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #8 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/30/2020. (ebb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Novus Inc., Parfois PR LLC (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 "Motion For Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Complaint." Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/20/2020. (ebb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/21/2020 to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E, DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E, DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noting #4 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/18/2020. (ebb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Amended NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of All Defendants (Estrella, Alberto)
November 16, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR- PDF filed in fillable format. Counsel to correct and re-file.*** (idg)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR- PDF filed in fillable format. Counsel to correct and re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E, DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E, DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E (Estrella, Alberto) Modified to file in error on 11/17/2020 (idg).
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-7085871), filed by DDR CAYEY LLC S.E, DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E., DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E, DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E, DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E, DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E., DDR ISABELA LLC S.E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novus Inc. et al v. DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR ISABELA LLC S.E
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR PALMA REAL LLC S.E
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR RIO HONDO LLC S.E
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR ESCORIAL LLC S.E.
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR CAYEY LLC S.E
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR DEL NORTE LLC S.E
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR DEL SOL LLC. S.E.
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novus Inc.
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Glorimar Irene-Abel
Represented By: Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera
Represented By: Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parfois PR LLC
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Glorimar Irene-Abel
Represented By: Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera
Represented By: Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?