SantiagoConcepcion et al v. Davol, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Natividad Concepcion Rivera and Rosa Maria SantiagoConcepcion
Defendant: Francisco A. Batlle Batlle, C.R. Bard, Inc., Bard Shannon Ltd. and Davol, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01695
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Case transferred out to the Southern District of Ohio through the extract civil case utility, sending e-mail to OHSDdb_InterdistrictTransfer@ohsd.uscourts.gov (gav)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-65 received from the Southern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 E-mail notification) (gav)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-65) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Ohio re: MDL # 2846. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols on 12/21/2020. (gav) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2020: #1 NEF) (gav). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2020: #2 Tag along actions) (gav).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/17/2020.(gav)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Velez-Colon, Jose)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, Superior Court of San Juan, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, case number SJ2020CV03729. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-7110371), filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc., Bard Shannon Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Action Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Translation of State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet, #7 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Martinez-Casado, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SantiagoConcepcion et al v. Davol, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco A. Batlle Batlle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Shannon Ltd.
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natividad Concepcion Rivera
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Maria SantiagoConcepcion
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?