Colon Cabrera et al v. Adcox et al
Plaintiff: Juan Alberto Colon Cabrera and Maria Teresa Lopez Beguiristain
Defendant: Kathy Lyn Wilkes and James Charles Adcox
Case Number: 3:2020cv01705
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/1/2021. (DMA)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2021 to File Answer or to Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Maria Teresa Lopez Beguiristain, Juan Alberto Colon Cabrera filed by Manuel Fernandez-Bared on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Fernandez-Bared, Manuel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Fernandez-Bared on behalf of All Defendants (Fernandez-Bared, Manuel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to James Charles Adcox, Kathy Lyn Wilkes (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Plaintiffs Summons - Kathy Lyn Wilkes. re #1 Complaint . (Cintron-Colon, Jose) Modified on 12/21/2020 change event, edit text (gav).
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Plaintiffs -Summons - James Charles Adcox re #1 Complaint. (Cintron-Colon, Jose) Modified on 12/21/2020 change event, edit text (gav).
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits - Summons - re #1 COMPLAINT filed by Jose R. Cintron-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Cintron-Colon, Jose) Modified on 12/18/2020 change event (gav).
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $402 receipt number PRX100074604.) (vdm)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits: Category Sheet filed by Jose R. Cintron-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Cintron-Colon, Jose) Modified to correct event type on 12/16/2020 (rim).
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1. James Charles Adcox, et.al.,. COMPLAINT, filed by Juan Alberto Colon Cabrera, et.al., re: non-payment of filing fees. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 12/14/2020. (arg)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 12/14/2020. (arg)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Juan Alberto Colon Cabrera, Maria Teresa Lopez Beguiristain. Service due by 3/10/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase & Sale Agreement)(Cintron-Colon, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon Cabrera et al v. Adcox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lyn Wilkes
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Charles Adcox
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Alberto Colon Cabrera
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Lopez Beguiristain
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?