Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Hernandez-Echevarria
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Maria de los Angeles Hernandez-Echevarria
Case Number: 3:2020cv01714
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION requesting Order to secure the property filed by Iones A. Rivera-Jimenez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 2/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of proposed order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of proposed order)(Rivera-Jimenez, Iones)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Entry as to Maria de los Angeles Hernandez-Echevarria filed by Iones A. Rivera-Jimenez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 2/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Jimenez, Iones)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. upon Maria de los Angeles Hernandez-Echevarria served on 1/9/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Rivera-Jimenez, Iones)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Maria de los Angeles Hernandez-Echevarria (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (vdm)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maria de los Angeles Hernandez-Echevarria ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7119536.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. Service due by 3/15/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Category, #4 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Rivera-Jimenez, Iones)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Hernandez-Echevarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Iones A. Rivera-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria de los Angeles Hernandez-Echevarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?