United States of America v. Arocho-Cruz et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Enemias Arocho-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Arocho-Rosario and Blanca Iris Rosario-Roman
Case Number: 3:2020cv01716
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay. Pursuant to an administrative order issued by the Farm Service Agency's Acting Administrator dated January 26, 2021, the instant case is hereby STAYED until March 31, 2021. Plaintiffs are to provide a Status Report within that same date as to the steps to follow thereafter. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/5/2021. (CBM)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay until March 31, 2021 filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) Modified on 2/3/2021 remove italics (gav).
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Enemias Arocho-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Arocho-Rosario, Blanca Iris Rosario-Roman. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. (vdm)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 3/15/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit $42,500 Note, #2 Exhibit Deed 130, #3 Exhibit Title Searches, #4 Exhibit COI, #5 Exhibit SCRA's, #6 Summons Blanca Rosario, #7 Summons Conjugal Partnership, #8 Summons Enemias Arocho, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Arocho-Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enemias Arocho-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Arocho-Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Iris Rosario-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?