Great Healthworks, Inc. v. Borinquen Natural. LLC
Plaintiff: Great Healthworks, Inc.
Defendant: BORINQUEN NATURAL LLC and Borinquen Natural, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01732
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties have failed to comply with the Order at Docket 14 as they did not inform the status of settlement negotiations by February 15, 2021. The parties shall inform the status of settlement negotiations by March 3, 2021. Failure to comply with this revised deadline may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/17/2021. (mrr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Settlement Negotiation filed by Borinquen Natural, LLC, Jose Estevez-Cabrera, pro se. Responses due by 3/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (rim)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 Mail sent to Jose Estevez Cabrera re 14 Order was returned as undeliverable. (gav)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for extension of time. By February 15, 2021, the parties shall inform whether they have settled the case. If the parties fail to settle the case by that date, then defendant shall plead or otherwise defend by March 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/1/2021. (mrr)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time until February 11, 2021 to to advise the Court of the status of the proposed settlement, filed by Jose Estevez-Cabrera, pro se in representation of Borinquen Natural, LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (rim) Modified to add filer on 1/29/2021 (rim).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall inform of the status of the proposed settlement by January 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/25/2021. (mrr)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2021 to File Answer filed by Miguel Oppenheimer on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 2/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Oppenheimer, Miguel) Modified to add filers on 1/25/2021 (rim).
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Great Healthworks, Inc..(Oppenheimer, Miguel)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement byGreat Healthworks, Inc.. (Oppenheimer, Miguel)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall advise of the status of settlement efforts or plead or otherwise defend by 1/21/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/15/2021. (mrr)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/21/2021 to File Answer filed by Miguel Oppenheimer on behalf of Great Healthworks, Inc. Responses due by 1/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Oppenheimer, Miguel)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Healthworks, Inc. upon Borinquen Natural, LLC. served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. (Oppenheimer, Miguel) Modified on 1/4/2021 to edit docket text (mcm).
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to BORINQUEN NATURAL LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support filed by Great Healthworks, Inc. Re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Great Healthworks, Inc. filed by Great Healthworks, Inc.. (Oppenheimer, Miguel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miguel Oppenheimer on behalf of Great Healthworks, Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration J Reyes, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A J Reyes, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B J Reyes, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Certification, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Oppenheimer, Miguel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BORINQUEN NATURAL LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7126407.), filed by Great Healthworks, Inc.. Service due by 3/22/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit Infringing Mark & Trade Dress, #4 Summons, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oppenheimer, Miguel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Healthworks, Inc. v. Borinquen Natural. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Healthworks, Inc.
Represented By: Miguel Oppenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORINQUEN NATURAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borinquen Natural, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?