United States of America v. Municipality of San Juan
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Municipality of San Juan
Case Number: 3:2020cv01744
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by United States of America. (Martorani-Dale, David)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Motion to Continue. GRANTED. Due date for Pre-Trial Memorandum is extended up to August 26, 2022. Memorandum Filing due by 8/26/2022. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/19/2022. (ao)
August 15, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Filing of ISC Memorandum Until August 26, 2022 filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 8/29/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martorani-Dale, David)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Parties are to submit a Joint Proposed Initial Scheduling Memorandum, which must include the parties factual and legal background and theories of the case. The parties are granted until 8/16/2022 to comply. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions. In addition, the parties are granted until 8/16/2022, to state whether they consent to the trial jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/1/2022.(wm) (Main Document 10 replaced to correct signature date on 8/4/2022) (idg).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America filed by Municipality of San Juan. MOOT in light of filing at ECF No. 8. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/10/2021. (wm)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Angel A. Valencia-Aponte on behalf of Defendant Municipality of San Juan.(Valencia-Aponte, Angel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America filed by Angel A. Valencia-Aponte on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valencia-Aponte, Angel)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 7, 2021 to File Answer and Notice of Appearance re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America filed by Municipality of San Juan. Noted and Granted. Answer deadline due by 6/7/2021.Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/15/2021.(wm)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time until June 7, 2021 to File Answer and Notice of Appearance re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America filed by Angel A. Valencia-Aponte on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 4/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valencia-Aponte, Angel) Modifiedttitle on 4/8/2021 (idg).
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 USM Return of Civil Penalty executed as to Municipality of San Juan on 3/16/2021. (idg)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Municipality of San Juan (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Municipality of San Juan filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 3/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Summons - Municipality of San Juan)(Martorani-Dale, David)
December 28, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT : Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (ad)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Municipality of San Juan, filed by United States of America. Service due by 3/23/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Quitclaim Deed, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martorani-Dale, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Municipality of San Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of San Juan
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?