United States of America v. Figueroa-Velazquez et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Figueroa-Montanez, Leonides Ortiz-Alvarado, Maria Milagros Montanez-Figueroa, Jose Manuel Blanco-Flores, Conjugal Partnership Blanco-Ortiz and Enrique Figueroa-Velazquez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01759
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. Pursuant to the moratorium informed by plaintiff, the case is stayed until March 31, 2021. Plaintiff shall file an informative motion by April 1, 2021 informing whether continuing the stay is warranted or the proceedings shall continue. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/9/2021. (wm)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay until March 31, 2021 filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 2/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jose Manuel Blanco-Flores, Conjugal Partnership Blanco-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Figueroa-Montanez, Enrique Figueroa-Velazquez, Maria Milagros Montanez-Figueroa, Leonides Ortiz-Alvarado (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 30, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT : Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (ad)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 3/29/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit $75,000 Note, #2 Exhibit Deed 206, #3 Exhibit Deed 92, #4 Exhibit $10,000 Note, #5 Exhibit Deed 207, #6 Exhibit Deed 93, #7 Exhibit Property 17,204, #8 Exhibit COI, #9 Exhibit SCRA, #10 Summons Conjugal Partnership Blanco-Ortiz, #11 Summons Conjugal Partnership Figueroa-Montanez, #12 Summons Enrique Figueroa, #13 Summons Jose Blanco, #14 Summons Leonides Ortiz, #15 Summons Maria Montanez, #16 Category Sheet, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Figueroa-Velazquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Figueroa-Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonides Ortiz-Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Milagros Montanez-Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Manuel Blanco-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Blanco-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Figueroa-Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?