Ruiz-Romero v. Department of Education of the United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero
Defendant: Pontificia Universidad Catolica Ponce, Department of Education of the United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice and U.S. Attorney's Office District of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2021cv01040
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon U.S. Attorney's Office District of Puerto Rico served on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (ecc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2021: # 1 USM-285 & Summons) (ecc).
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Pontificia Universidad Catolica Ponce served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (ecc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2021: #1 USM-285) (ecc).
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT ENTRY*** USM Return of Summons Executed as to Pontificia Universidad Catolica de Puerto Rico on 3/4/2021. (ecc) Modified on 3/24/2021 (ecc).
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT ENTRY*** Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office District of Puerto Rico. (ecc) Modified on 3/24/2021 (ecc).
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT ENTRY*** USM Return of Summons Executed as to U.S. Attorney's Office District of Puerto Rico on 3/4/2021. (ecc) Modified on 3/24/2021 (ecc).
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT of Counsel re 5 Order. Attorney Marcos L. De-La-Villa-Rodriguez Appointed for Ernesto Ruiz-Romero. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/2021.(ab)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Department of Education of the United States of America, Pontificia Universidad Catolica Ponce through the USMS, with copy of the order, complaint and USM-285. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. The United States Marshal will serve summons on the defendants. The Clerk will appoint new pro bono counsel for plaintiff pursuant to Local Rule 83L. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/01/2021. (brc)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 3), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Clerk on 01/29/2021. (gr)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby recuses himself from participation in this case. The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another U.S. district judge. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/29/2021. (gr)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, Pro Se. Responses due by 2/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (In the Spanish Language) against Department of Education of the United States of America and Pontificia Universidad Catolica Ponce, filed by Ernesto Ruiz-Romero, Pro Se Service due by 4/26/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz-Romero v. Department of Education of the United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Ruiz-Romero
Represented By: Marcos L. De-La-Villa-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pontificia Universidad Catolica Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Education of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office District of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?