Segura-Ledesma v. Pueblo de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Eglis A Segura-Ledesma
Defendant: Pueblo de Puerto Rico and Orlando Cameron Gordon
Case Number: 3:2021cv01058
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noting and Granting #10 "Notice of Appearance and Request For Extension of Time." The appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 4/26/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/24/2021. (ebb)
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance and request for Extension of Time by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Pueblo de Puerto Rico (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Orlando Cameron Gordon, Pueblo de Puerto Rico filed by Eglis A Segura-Ledesma, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mcm)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Defective Pleading. Lacks proper signature. Documents presented to the court in paper require a handwritten signature. L.Civ.R. 11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (mcm)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR - Complaint missing signature.*** MOTION in the Spanish language Submitting Complaint in the English language re: 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Complaint filed by Eglis A Segura-Ledesma filed by Eglis A Segura-Ledesma, Pro Se. Responses due by 3/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in the English Language)(Related document(s) 4 , #3 ) (mcm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2021: #2 Envelope) (mcm). Modified on 3/9/2021 (mcm).
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM upon Orlando Cameron Gordon served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021; Pueblo de Puerto Rico served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (mcm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Orlando Cameron Gordon, Pueblo de Puerto Rico through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 "Pro se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis." The U.S. Marshals Service shall serve process upon defendants accordingly. Plaintiff is granted until March 8, 2021, to refile in English or submit a certified English translation of the complaint and all of the supporting documents as required by 48 U.S.C. Sec. 864 ("[a]ll pleadings and proceedings in the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico shall be conducted in the English language") and Local Rule 5(g) ("[a]ll documents not in the English language which are presented or filed, whether as evidence or otherwise, must be accompanied by a certified translation into English prepared by an interpreter certified by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts"). Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/8/2021. (LMR)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Orlando Cameron Gordon, Pueblo de Puerto Rico, filed by Eglis A Segura-Ledesma, Pro Se. Service due by 5/6/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eglis A Segura-Ledesma, Pro Se. (ad)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eglis A Segura-Ledesma, Pro Se. Responses due by 2/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segura-Ledesma v. Pueblo de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Cameron Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eglis A Segura-Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?