Negron-Adames et al v. Dorado Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johanna Negron-Adames, Joanlyn Quinones-Negron and Roberto Quinones-Negron
Defendant: Jane Doe, SIMED, The Medical Protective Company d/b/a MedPro Group, Bayamon Medical Center Corp., John Doe, Patty Poe, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Co., Edwin Baez-Montalvo, PRMDIC, Patty Doe, Francisco Dubocq-Berdeguez, Companies A-Z, Dorado Health, Inc., Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe, The Medical Protective Company doing business as MedPro Group and Conjugal Partnership Dubocq-Poe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01077
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Michael C. McCall on behalf of Defendant Bayamon Medical Center Corp..(McCall, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Defendant SIMED.(Lopez, Jeannette)
April 14, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for extension of time until May 14, 2021 to answer the Complaint or to otherwise plead filed by Michael C. McCall on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. Responses due by 4/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (McCall, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Filing 22 Second MOTION requesting Order filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
April 14, 2021 Filing 21 Second MOTION requesting Order filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 4/15/2021. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/8/2021. (EES)
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Johanna Negron-Adames filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of SIMED Responses due by 4/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez, Jeannette)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of SIMED as insurer of Dr. Francisco Dubocq-Berdeguez (Lopez, Jeannette) Modified docket text on 3/29/2021 (rim).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/2/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/2/2022.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/23/2021.1.The case will be trial ready by September 20222.A joint final pre-trial memorandum will be filed by April 20223.Discovery will be completed by January 2, 20224.Dispositive motions will be filed by January 2, 20225.Preserving all parties rights, they shall, within thirty days of the date of this order, file a joint proposed case management scheduling order consistent with the above dates. The parties may agree to advance these dates but may not agree to delay them.6.No motion for a continuance will be entertained that does not recite the above dates and explain how and why any such continuance will affect them.SO ORDERED.(EES)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for extension of time; granting #10 Motion for extension of time; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #15 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/23/2021. (EES)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time until 04/15/2021 to ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle on behalf of Francisco Dubocq-Berdeguez Responses due by 3/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Del-Valle, Benjamin)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to SIMED as insurer of Dr. Edwin Baez-Montalvo by Johanna Negron-Adames, Joanlyn Quinones-Negron, Roberto Quinones-Negron (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 14, 2021 to file Answer to the Complaint or to otherwise plead filed by Michael C. McCall on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. Responses due by 3/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (McCall, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION requesting Order filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION requesting Order filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time until April 14, 2021 to answer the complaint or to otherwise plead filed by Michael C. McCall on behalf of Bayamon Medical Center Corp. Responses due by 3/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (McCall, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time until 4/12/21 to extension of time to plead filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Edwin Baez-Montalvo, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Co. Responses due by 3/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Edwin Baez-Montalvo served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021; Bayamon Medical Center Corp. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021; Conjugal Partnership Dubocq-Poe served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021; Dorado Health, Inc. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Francisco Dubocq-Berdeguez served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021; Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Co. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; SIMED served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; The Medical Protective Company served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Fernandez-Muzaurieta, Alejandro)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fernandez-Muzaurieta, Alejandro)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bayamon Medical Center Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits: Summons as to Bayamon Medical Center Corp. filed by Pedro F. Soler-Muniz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issuance of summons)(Soler-Muniz, Pedro) Modified correct docket event on 2/18/2021 (rim).
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edwin Baez-Montalvo, Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Dubocq-Poe, Jane Doe, Dorado Health, Inc., Francisco Dubocq-Berdeguez, Patty Poe, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Co., SIMED, The Medical Protective Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7187302.), filed by Johanna Negron-Adames. Service due by 5/17/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Summons Summons, #10 Summons Summons, #11 Summons Summons, #12 Summons Summons)(Soler-Muniz, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron-Adames et al v. Dorado Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMED
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Protective Company d/b/a MedPro Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayamon Medical Center Corp.
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Baez-Montalvo
Represented By: Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRMDIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Dubocq-Berdeguez
Represented By: Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companies A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Protective Company doing business as MedPro Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Dubocq-Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Negron-Adames
Represented By: Pedro F. Soler-Muniz
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Represented By: Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanlyn Quinones-Negron
Represented By: Pedro F. Soler-Muniz
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Represented By: Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Quinones-Negron
Represented By: Pedro F. Soler-Muniz
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Represented By: Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?