Martinez v. Torres-Rivera et al
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez and Jose R. Martinez-Arroyo
Defendant: Jane Doe, XYZ Companies, Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe, John Doe, Lt. Richard Roe, Edwin Torres-Rivera, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguros de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED), XYZ Insurance Companies and XYZ Entities
Case Number: 3:2021cv01113
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear. Granting as requested #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by June 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/5/2021. (MES)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 4, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jose R. Martinez-Arroyo filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguros de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED), Edwin Torres-Rivera Responses due by 5/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguros de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED), Edwin Torres-Rivera Responses due by 5/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguros de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED) served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Edwin Torres-Rivera served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS:(1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (mg)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguros de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED), Edwin Torres-Rivera (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7216799.), filed by Jose Martinez. Service due by 6/8/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Dr. Edwin Torres, #4 Summons Summons Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe, #5 Summons Summons SIMED)(Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Torres-Rivera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Torres-Rivera
Represented By: Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguros de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED)
Represented By: Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez
Represented By: Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R. Martinez-Arroyo
Represented By: Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?