Union De Tronquista De Puerto Rico, Local 901 v. Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC
Plaintiff: Union De Tronquista De Puerto Rico, Local 901
Defendant: Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01164
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting CERTIFIED TRANSLATIONS re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC filed by Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte on behalf of Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC Responses due by 5/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation of Exhibit A of Notice for Removal)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Ugarte, Nicole)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/16/2021. (lir)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance filed by Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte on behalf of Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC Responses due by 4/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Ugarte, Nicole) Modified on 4/16/2021 to edit event(gav).
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for extension of time until May 15, 2021 to submit the certified translations filed by Jose A. Silva-Cofresi on behalf of Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC Responses due by 4/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Silva-Cofresi, Jose)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number SJ2021CV01956. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7263397), filed by Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Review, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet Jos A. Silva-Cofres, Esq., #4 Category Sheet Nicole Rodrguez-Ugarte, Esq.)(Silva-Cofresi, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union De Tronquista De Puerto Rico, Local 901 v. Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsi Cola Puerto Rico Distributing, LLC
Represented By: Jose A. Silva-Cofresi
Represented By: Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union De Tronquista De Puerto Rico, Local 901
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Jose E. Carreras-Rovira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?