Ortiz-Olivera v. Doctors' Center Hospital Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Ortiz-Olivera
Defendant: Dr. Manuel Morales-Maldonado, Doctors' Center Hospital Inc., Doctors' Center Hospital of Manati Inc., Dr. Jorge Vazquez-Marcano, Dr. Alberto Ramirez-Lopez, Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Ramirez-Doe and Conjugal Partnership Morales-Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01169
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Doctors' Center Hospital Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons Re Doctors' Center Hospital Inc. (Agrait-Llado, Jaime)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Doctors' Center Hospital of Manati Inc., Dr. Manuel Morales-Maldonado, Dr. Alberto Ramirez-Lopez and Dr. Jorge Vazquez-Marcano. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons Re all defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons Doctors' Center Manati, #2 Summons Dr. Alberto Ramrez, #3 Summons Dr. Jorge Vzquez, #4 Summons Dr. Manuel Morales) (Agrait-Llado, Jaime)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7266991.), filed by Sandra J. Ortiz-Olivera. Service due by 7/19/2021, (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Agrait-Llado, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz-Olivera v. Doctors' Center Hospital Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Manuel Morales-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors' Center Hospital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors' Center Hospital of Manati Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jorge Vazquez-Marcano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alberto Ramirez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Ramirez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Morales-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Ortiz-Olivera
Represented By: Jaime F. Agrait-Llado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?