Rivera v. PVH Puerto Rico, Inc
Plaintiff: Scherayza Rivera and Scherayza Rivera-Irizarry
Defendant: PVH Puerto Rico, Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv01191
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/27/2021.(jg)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/27/2021. (jg)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss voluntary dismissal as to All Parties filed by Enrique J. Mendoza-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mendoza-Mendez, Enrique)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Summons duly served filed by Enrique J. Mendoza-Mendez on behalf of Scherayza Rivera-Irizarry Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons served summon)(Mendoza-Mendez, Enrique)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/4/2021. (EES)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Submitting complaint with exhibits filed by Enrique J. Mendoza-Mendez on behalf of Scherayza Rivera-Irizarry Responses due by 5/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint with exhibits)(Mendoza-Mendez, Enrique)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to PVH Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young. (vdm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scherayza Rivera ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7276620.), filed by Scherayza Rivera. Service due by 7/26/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit attorney of records for civil cover sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Mendoza-Mendez, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. PVH Puerto Rico, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scherayza Rivera
Represented By: Enrique J. Mendoza-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scherayza Rivera-Irizarry
Represented By: Enrique J. Mendoza-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVH Puerto Rico, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?