Ayala-Lopez v. USA
Plaintiff: Carlos L. Ayala-Lopez
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv01194
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 06/04/2021. (lir)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until August 2, 2021 to renew/investigate 2255 claims further filed by Leonardo M. Aldridge on behalf of Carlos L. Ayala-Lopez Responses due by 6/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aldridge, Leonardo)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Counsel shall confer with Petitioner to (i) review the legal requirements of the claims filed before this Court; and (ii) provide Petitioner with an initial assessment of the viability of these claims. See Docket No. #2 . Counsel shall file an amended 2255 petition by 05/28/2021. Considering that counsel was appointed almost three years ago, see Cr. No. 03-055, Docket No. 1670; the Court will not allow extensions of time absent good cause. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/27/2021. (ERC)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Court hereby appointed Leonardo Aldridge to represent defendant in this case under the Criminal Justice Act. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/26/2021.(su)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255)- (Criminal Number 03-055 (1) filed by Carlos L. Ayala-Lopez, Pro Se. Responses due by 5/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (su)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 REMARK: This case is open pursuant to ORDER #1683 in Criminal Case 3:03-cr-00055-001(JAG): "Ordering the Clerk of Court to Open a Civil Case regarding #1660 Second Motion to Vacate NUNC PRO TUNC 11/4/2016." (su)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala-Lopez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos L. Ayala-Lopez
Represented By: Leonardo M. Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?