Martinez-Cordova v. Social Security Commissioner
Plaintiff: Mr. Edgar E Martinez-Cordova
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region II, W. Stephen Muldrow, Raymond S. Egan and Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 3:2021cv01204
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Raymond S. Egan, Merrick B. Garland, W. Stephen Muldrow, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region II, Social Security Commissioner (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
May 20, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 14), this case has been assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. 636. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 21-1204 (BJM). Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 05/20/2021. (ft)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. sec. 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/20/2021. (MES)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #11 Motion to Transfer Case. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. sec. 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/19/2021. (MES)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits 5 Summons re #7 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by Edgar E Martinez-Cordova (Perez-Feliciano, Angel)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to transfer case to Magistrate Judge filed by Angel Perez-Feliciano on behalf of Edgar E Martinez-Cordova Responses due by 6/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Feliciano, Angel)
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** ***FILED IN ERROR Wrong Event*** MOTION to transfer case to Magistrate Judge filed by Angel Perez-Feliciano on behalf of Edgar E Martinez-Cordova Responses due by 5/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Motion)(Perez-Feliciano, Angel) Modified on 5/18/2021 (mg).
May 18, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #9 Subpoena Issued, #10 MOTION to transfer case to Magistrate Judge.***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** ***FILED IN ERROR Wrong Event*** Counsel to re-file Motion (as main document & SUMMONS as main document, both in separate filings, using correct event as to both filings. Please refrain from filing Complaint as main document with every filing. (mg)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** ***FILED IN ERROR Wrong Event*** *RESTRICTED* Subpoena Issued (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Perez-Feliciano, Angel) Modified on 5/18/2021 (mg).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 3 : Plaintiff shall inform the Court by tomorrow whether the plaintiff consents to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Commissioner has generically agreed to do so in all social security appeals. Consent will greatly expedite resolution of the present appeal, given the district judges' extremely congested criminal docket. Motion due by May 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/17/2021. (MES)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against SSA Commissioner against Edgar E Martinez-Cordova ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7291624.), filed by Edgar E Martinez-Cordova. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perez-Feliciano, Angel)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR***ORDER: Noting #4 Complaint. Plaintiff shall inform the Court by tomorrow whether the plaintiff consents to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge as per 3 Order. Motion due by May 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/17/2021. (MES) Modified on 5/17/2021 docket no. #4 Filed in Error (mg).
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** ***FILED IN ERROR Wrong Event*** NOTICE against SSA Commissioner by Edgar E Martinez-Cordova (Perez-Feliciano, Angel) Modified on 5/17/2021 (mg).
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** ***FILED IN ERROR Wrong Event*** AMENDED DOCUMENT by Edgar E Martinez-Cordova. Amendment to #1 Complaint, against SSA Commissioner. (Perez-Feliciano, Angel) Modified on 5/17/2021 (mg).
May 17, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Amended Document, #5 Notice (Other).***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** ***FILED IN ERROR Wrong Event. Counsel is advised to file Complaint as main document and using the appropriate event.*** (mg)
May 12, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #1 Complaint. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (mg)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff shall, on or before May 14, 2021, inform the Court whether the plaintiff consents to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge. The Commissioner has generically agreed to do so in all social security appeals. Consent will greatly expedite resolution of the present appeal, given the district judges' extremely congested criminal docket Motions due by 5/14/2021.Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/11/2021. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/11/2021.(MET)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** COMPLAINT against Social Security Commissioner ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7291624.), filed by Edgar E Martinez-Cordova. Service due by 8/4/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Perez-Feliciano, Angel) Modified on 5/12/2021 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Cordova v. Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Stephen Muldrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond S. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Edgar E Martinez-Cordova
Represented By: Angel Perez-Feliciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?