United States of America v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Department of Sports and Recreation, Ray Quinones, Pedro R. Pierluisi, Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez and Department of Justice of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2021cv01248
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Department of Sports and Recreation, Ray Quinones (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Issuance of Summons. The Clerk of the Court shall issue the summons. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/14/2021. (mrr)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Department of Sports and Recreation, Ray Quinones filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 7/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Martorani-Dale, David)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Department of Sports and Recreation, Ray Quinones, filed by United States of America.(Martorani-Dale, David)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. AUSA Jorge L. Matos withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/13/2021. (mrr)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jorge L. Matos filed by Jorge L. Matos on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 7/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Matos, Jorge)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of United States of America (Martorani-Dale, David)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al., filed by United States of America. Service due by 8/30/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B Category Sheet)(Matos, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Department of Sports and Recreation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro R. Pierluisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jorge L. Matos
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?