Fontanez-Rivera et al v. Suiza Dairy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Irma Santos-De Jesus, Community Property Partnership Fontanez-Santos and Roberto Fontanez-Rivera
Defendant: Triple-S Salud Inc, Suiza Dairy Corporation and Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01257
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to dismiss claims under COBRA as to Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc., Triple-S Salud Inc, MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COBRA Notice)(Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres)
July 27, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Defendant Suiza Dairy Corporation.(Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 27, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Defendant Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc..(Rivera-Rios, Victor)
July 14, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
July 14, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation of Notice and Transfer Order from State Court filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation - Notice and Transfer Order)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION Submitting certified translation of filed Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 7/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation -Complaint)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
July 12, 2021 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 27, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Triple-S Salud Inc filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corporation Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendant Triple-S Salud Inc.(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
July 12, 2021 Filing 21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2021 to File Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Triple-S Salud Inc filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
July 2, 2021 Filing 20 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 7/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 7/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Suiza Dairy Corporation. #15 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Triple-S Salud Inc, #17 MOTION for extension of time until July 4, 2021 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc. The Motions for Extension of time are GRANTED. Answers due by 7/12/2021. A motion to dismiss will not be accepted in lieu of an Answer. This extension of time does not apply to the 30-day period to move for remand.Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/16/2021.(wm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time until July 4, 2021 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 6/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance Without Submitting to the Jurisdiction by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (Docket No. 13), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Signed by Clerk on 06/11/2021. (ft)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk shall assign the case to another United States District Judge. Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll recused. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 6/11/2021. (MCV)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #11 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2021. (ft)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL: See attached. The Clerk shall assign the case to another United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/10/2021.(MPL)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Yldefonso Lopez-Morales on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corporation (Lopez-Morales, Yldefonso)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal, and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corporation (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noting #7 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/9/2021. (ebb)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet) (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a).Civil Cover Sheet(JS44) is incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/8/2021. (arg)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Salud Inc Responses due by 6/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byTriple-S Salud Inc. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Instance San Juan Superior Court, case number SJ2021CV3138. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7327087), filed by Triple-S Salud Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Court Order, #3 Exhibit Court Notice, #4 Exhibit Motion to be presented in State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Cover Sheet)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontanez-Rivera et al v. Suiza Dairy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Santos-De Jesus
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Property Partnership Fontanez-Santos
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Fontanez-Rivera
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Salud Inc
Represented By: Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez
Represented By: Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suiza Dairy Corporation
Represented By: Yldefonso Lopez-Morales
Represented By: Natalia Marin-Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?