Richan v. Ageiss Inc.
Plaintiff: Ted S Richan and Ted S. Richan
Defendant: Ageiss Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01266
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to August 16, 2021 as to #12 MOTION to dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer as to Ted S. Richan filed by Ageiss Inc., #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ageiss Inc. filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Ted S. Richan Responses due by 8/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #12 , #11 ) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer as to Ted S. Richan filed by Tatiana Leal-Gonzalez on behalf of Ageiss Inc. Responses due by 7/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Leal-Gonzalez, Tatiana)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Tatiana Leal-Gonzalez on behalf of Ageiss Inc. Responses due by 7/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Leal-Gonzalez, Tatiana)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Parties are to submit a Joint Case management Memorandum. Memorandum Filing due by 8/31/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/16/2021.(wm)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #2 MOTION for extension of time until June 14, 2021 to file english certified translation MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language docu filed by Ageiss Inc. and for extension of time until June 14, 2021 to file english certified translation MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents., MOOT in view of filing at ECF No. 6. #6 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ageiss Inc., filed by Ageiss Inc. NOTED. #7 MOTION for extension of time until August 16, 2021 to file answer to complaint or otherwise plead filed by Ageiss Inc. GRANTED as requested (due by 8/16/2021.) Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/16/2021.(wm)
July 16, 2021 Motions terminated: #2 MOTION for extension of time until June 14, 2021 to file english certified translation and for extension of time until June 14, 2021 to file english certified translation MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Ageiss Inc., #6 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ageiss Inc., #7 MOTION for extension of time until August 16, 2021 to file answer to complaint or otherwise plead filed by Ageiss Inc. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/16/2021.(wm)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Filing of Motion to Consolidate filed by Ted S. Richan, #5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Substitution of Exhibit A to motion at docket 4 filed by Ted S. Richan. The informative motions at ECF Nos. 4 and 5 are noted. The undersigned has no objection to the consolidation of Civ. Case No. 21-1266 with Civ. Case No. 21-1222( WGY). This remains subject to the final determination of the Honorable William G.Young. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/17/2021.(wm)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time until August 16, 2021 to file answer to complaint or otherwise plead filed by Tatiana Leal-Gonzalez on behalf of Ageiss Inc. Responses due by 6/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Leal-Gonzalez, Tatiana)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ageiss Inc., #2 MOTION for extension of time until June 14, 2021 to file english certified translation MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Ageiss Inc. filed by Tatiana Leal-Gonzalez on behalf of Ageiss Inc. Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1 , #2 ) (Leal-Gonzalez, Tatiana)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Substitution of Exhibit A to motion at docket 4 filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Ted S Richan Responses due by 6/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Filing of Motion to Consolidate filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Ted S Richan Responses due by 6/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for extension of time until June 14, 2021 to file english certified translation, MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Tatiana Leal-Gonzalez on behalf of Ageiss Inc. Responses due by 6/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Leal-Gonzalez, Tatiana)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, San Juan Judicial Center, Superior Part, case number SJ2021CV03092. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7330079), filed by Ageiss Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Santos-Caraballo, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richan v. Ageiss Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted S Richan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted S. Richan
Represented By: Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ageiss Inc.
Represented By: Tatiana Leal-Gonzalez
Represented By: Juan F. Santos-Caraballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?