Santiago-Negron v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Antonio Santiago-Negron
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv01267
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noted #5 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 6/30/2021. (NV)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler for all proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 21-1267 (GLS). Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/30/2021. (ft)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Because plaintiff has also consented (Docket No. 5), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/30/2021. (MPL)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Motion In Compliance Consenting Magistrate Judge as to 3 Order, filed by Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte on behalf of Antonio Santiago-Negron Responses due by 7/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 3 ) (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Therefore, not later June 22, 2021, plaintiff shall inform if he consents as well. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/8/2021. (MPL)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7330179.), filed by Antonio Santiago-Negron. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney Gen, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Social Security)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago-Negron v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Santiago-Negron
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?